McCullers v. Housing Authority of the City of Raleigh
Plaintiff: Ms. Brittney McCullers and Brittney McCullers
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of Raleigh
Case Number: 5:2018cv00429
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 11/19/18. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/15/2018. (Collins, S.)
October 10, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Service filed by Charles T. Francis regarding #10 Financial Disclosure Statement, #8 Notice of Appearance, #9 Notice of Appearance . (Francis, Charles)
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Housing Authority of the City of Raleigh. (Francis, Charles)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #11 Answer to Amended Complaint. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. Counsel is directed to refile. (Collins, S.)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #9 Notice of Appearance, #10 Financial Disclosure Statement, #8 Notice of Appearance. A Certificate of Service should accompany this filing. Counsel is directed to file the Certificate of Service using the event code titled as such located under the "Service of Process" category of civil filing events. (Collins, S.)
October 8, 2018 Filing 11 **Disregard - Corrected and refiled at #12 ** ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Housing Authority of the City of Raleigh. (Francis, Charles) Modified on 10/15/2018 (Collins, S.).
October 8, 2018 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Housing Authority of the City of Raleigh identifying Corporate Parent Housing Authority of the City of Raleigh, Corporate Parent Housing Authority of the City of Raleigh for Housing Authority of the City of Raleigh. (Francis, Charles)
October 8, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles T. Francis on behalf of All Defendants. (Francis, Charles)
October 8, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles T. Francis on behalf of All Defendants. (Francis, Charles)
October 8, 2018 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service for Affidavit of Service filed by Brittney McCullers served on Housing Authority of City of Raleigh on October 8, 2018. (Chester, Suzanne)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brittney McCullers. (Chester, Suzanne)
September 17, 2018 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:18-CV-429-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/17/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Suzanne Chester on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Chester, Suzanne)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Brittney McCullers (Holton, Charles)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles R. Holton on behalf of Brittney McCullers. (Holton, Charles)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Housing Authority of the City of Raleigh. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
September 4, 2018 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the civil summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
September 4, 2018 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
September 4, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Brittney McCullers. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brittney McCullers ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4642608.), filed by Brittney McCullers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Holton, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullers v. Housing Authority of the City of Raleigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of Raleigh
Represented By: Charles T. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Brittney McCullers
Represented By: Charles R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney McCullers
Represented By: Charles R. Holton
Represented By: Suzanne Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?