Blue v. Hill et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Blue
Defendant: Ruan Transport Corporation, Airgas Specialty Products, Inc., Randy L. Hill and Airgas USA, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00445
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Sellers, N.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Airgas USA, LLC, Randy L. Hill, Ruan Transport Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fisher, Jennifer)
November 6, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Ruan Transport Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production #19 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Defendant Ruan Transport Corporation, it is ordered that Plaintiff shall have up to and including December 10, 2018, within which to respond to Defendant Ruan Transport Corporations First Set of Interrogatories and First Request For Production of Documents. Counsel is reminded that pursuant to Rule 29 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, parties may stipulate to extend the time to respond to requests for discovery under Rules 33, 34, and 36 without approval from the court, provided the extension does not interfere with any time set for completion of discovery, for a hearing of a motion, or for trial.Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/6/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
November 6, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Sellers, N.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Anthony Blue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cowan, Coleman)
October 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #17 Consent MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Stipulation filed by Ruan Transport Corporation, Airgas USA, LLC, Randy L. Hill, Ruan Transport Management Systems Inc. Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 10/27/2018. (Sellers, N.)
October 24, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #17 Consent MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Stipulation. (Sellers, N.)
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Stipulation filed by Airgas USA, LLC, Randy L. Hill, Ruan Transport Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order) (Hoffman, Dana)
October 23, 2018 Notice to Counsel regarding: #16 Notice - other. These documents are discovery materials pursuant to Rule 26(a) which do not need to be filed unless ordered or needed (see Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 26(a) and LR 26.1(a)). (Sellers, N.)
October 22, 2018 Filing 16 Notice filed by Anthony Blue Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures. (Cowan, Coleman)
October 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/30/2019. Motions due by 9/27/2019. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 10/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Form) (Sellers, N.)
October 8, 2018 Filing 14 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Anthony Blue. (Cowan, Coleman)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/20/2018. (Sellers, N.)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Airgas USA, LLC, Randy L. Hill, Ruan Transport Corporation. (Hoffman, Dana)
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice for Airgas Specialty Products, Inc. by Anthony Blue (Cowan, Coleman)
September 19, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Coleman M. Cowan on behalf of Anthony Blue. (Cowan, Coleman)
September 18, 2018 Notice to Counsel regarding: #5 Financial Disclosure Statement, #7 Financial Disclosure Statement, #4 Financial Disclosure Statement, #6 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded for future filings, when using a fillable PDF form, the Court prefers that these forms be "flattened" pursuant to Section IV(B) of the Court's Electronic Policy and Procedure Manual available on the court's website. (Sellers, N.)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 Notice to Plaintiff's Counsel regarding Notice of Removal and need to make appearance. Sent to Coleman M. Cowan at Law Office of James Scott Farrin 280 S. Mangum Street, Suite 400 Durham, North Carolina 27701 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer C. Fisher on behalf of All Defendants. (Fisher, Jennifer)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Airgas Specialty Products, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Airgas, Inc. for Airgas Specialty Products, Inc.. (Hoffman, Dana)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Airgas USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Airgas, Inc. for Airgas USA, LLC. (Hoffman, Dana)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ruan Transport Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ruan Transport Management Systems Inc. for Ruan Transport Corporation. (Hoffman, Dana)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Randy L. Hill (Hoffman, Dana)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Dana H. Hoffman on behalf of All Defendants. (Hoffman, Dana)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 Notice filed by Airgas Specialty Products, Inc., Airgas USA, LLC, Randy L. Hill, Ruan Transport Corporation regarding #1 Notice of Removal,,, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Hoffman, Dana)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ruan Transport Corporation, Airgas Specialty Products, Inc., Randy L. Hill, Airgas USA, LLC from Vance County Superior Court, case number 18 CVS 737. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4655369), filed by Ruan Transport Corporation, Airgas Specialty Products, Inc., Randy L. Hill, Airgas USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index Index for Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A-Summons to Randy L. Hill and Ruan Transport Corporation, #3 Exhibit B-Summons to Airgas USA, LLC and Airgas Specialty Products, Inc., #4 Exhibit C-General Civil Action Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit D-Complaint (Jury Trial Demanded), #6 Exhibit E-Affidavit of Service by Certified Mail on Defendant Ruan Transport Corporation, Airgas USA, LLC and Airgas Specialty Products, Inc., #7 Exhibit F-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Hoffman, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue v. Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruan Transport Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer C. Fisher
Represented By: Dana H. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airgas Specialty Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer C. Fisher
Represented By: Dana H. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy L. Hill
Represented By: Jennifer C. Fisher
Represented By: Dana H. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airgas USA, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer C. Fisher
Represented By: Dana H. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Blue
Represented By: Coleman M. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?