Farmer's Friend, Inc. v. Unique Food Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Farmer's Friend, Inc.
Defendant: Gina Bissette, Louis J. Deangelis, Unique Food Company, Inc., Beverly A. Deangelis and Louis J. Deangelis, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00470
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Dismissing Case - It is ORDERED, as follows: 1. The Fidelity Bank is hereby authorized and directed to transfer $62,088.00 of funds held in accounts owned by Unique Food Company, Inc. to Farmer's Friend, Inc. forthwith. 2. Upon Fidelity Bank's transfer of $62,088.00 to Farmer's Friend, Inc. the Temporary Restraining Order entered in this case on September 28, 2018 [D.E. #9] shall be immediately dissolved. 3. This action is dismissed, without prejudice, as to all parties and all claims. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter to enforce the provisions of this order. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/4/2018. (Stouch, L.)
October 4, 2018 Remark - #11 Stipulation submitted to US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for review. (Stouch, L.)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Farmer's Friend, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order A) (Klinowski, Jason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 10/10/2018 at 03:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle. (Stouch, L.)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/28/2018. (Stouch, L.)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Jason R. Klinowski on behalf of Farmer's Friend, Inc.. (Klinowski, Jason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support regarding #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Farmer's Friend, Inc.. (Dalton, Luke)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Farmer's Friend, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff in Support) (Dalton, Luke)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Farmer's Friend, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attorney Certificate of No Notice Under Rule 65, #2 Affidavit Declaration In Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO) (Dalton, Luke)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gina Bissette, Beverly A. Deangelis, Louis J. Deangelis, Louis J. Deangelis, Jr, Unique Food Company, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
September 28, 2018 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Complaint. Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the proposed summons and civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Farmer's Friend, Inc. (Dalton, Luke)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Luke A. Dalton on behalf of Farmer's Friend, Inc.. (Dalton, Luke)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4670564.), filed by Farmer's Friend, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PACA Trust Damages Chart, #2 Proposed Summons - Beverly Deangelis, #3 Proposed Summons - Louis J. Deangelis, #4 Proposed Summons - Unique Food Company, Inc, #5 Proposed Summons - Louis J. Deangelis Jr, #6 Proposed Summons - Gina Bissette, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Dalton, Luke) (Attachment 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7 flattened and replaced on 9/28/2018) (Edwards, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer's Friend, Inc. v. Unique Food Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Bissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis J. Deangelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unique Food Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly A. Deangelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis J. Deangelis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmer's Friend, Inc.
Represented By: Luke A. Dalton
Represented By: Jason R. Klinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?