Casillas v. Sandoz Inc.
Plaintiff: MELBA CASILLAS
Defendant: SANDOZ INC.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00478
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Melba Casillas (Austin, John)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/15/2018. (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Melba Casillas. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
November 14, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by John S. Austin on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Austin, John)
November 8, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Sandoz Inc.. (Joyner, Kevin)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sandoz Inc. answer due 11/8/2018. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/29/2018. (Rudd, D.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 SECOND Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiffs' counsel John S. Austin, Esq. of Austin Law Firm, PLLC at P.O. Box 30, Raleigh, North Carolina 27602 mailed via US Mail on October 5, 2018 and second notice mailed via US mail on October 29, 2018. (Rudd, D.)
October 29, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Rudd, D.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Joyner, Kevin)
October 16, 2018 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sandoz Inc. (Erwin, Brodie)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Sandoz Inc. Answer due 11/1/2018. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/5/2018. (Rudd, D.)
October 5, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Rudd, D.)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiffs' counsel John S. Austin, Esq. of Austin Law Firm, PLLC at P.O. Box 30, Raleigh, North Carolina 27602 mailed via US Mail on October 5, 2018. (Rudd, D.)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to SANDOZ INC.. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 Notice filed by SANDOZ INC. regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Joyner, Kevin)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by SANDOZ INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Joyner, Kevin)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Brodie D. Erwin on behalf of SANDOZ INC.. (Erwin, Brodie)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by SANDOZ INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Joyner, Kevin)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Scott Joyner on behalf of SANDOZ INC.. (Joyner, Kevin)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SANDOZ INC. from Wake County Superior Court, case number 18-CVS-1258. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4678186), filed by SANDOZ INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Joyner, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casillas v. Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELBA CASILLAS
Represented By: John S. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC.
Represented By: Brodie D. Erwin
Represented By: Kevin Scott Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?