Oehman et al v. Concert MacGregor Downs, LLC
Plaintiff: Graham Lythgoe, Charlotte Teichman Oehman, Charles H. Munn, Robert Edward Oehman, Jr., Judy C. Munn and Kathryn Lythgoe
Defendant: Concert MacGregor Downs, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00508
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 23 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #18 MOTION to Remand, #19 Memorandum in Support, filed by Concert MacGregor Downs, LLC. (Isenberg, Natalia)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery in this case may be governed by a protective order. Discovery due by 12/2/19. Mediation Deadline set for 12/2/19. Motions due by 12/9/19. The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/10/18. (Collins, S.)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 12/31/2018. (Collins, S.)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave of Court to File In Paper Form. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/5/2018. (A copy of this Order was sent to plaintiffs' counsel via US mail directed to: Joshua D. Hansen, Hansen, Howell & Wilkie, PLLC, 1618 Glenwood Avenue, Raleigh, NC 27608.) (Collins, S.)
December 5, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #9 MOTION for Leave of Court to File In Paper Form. (Collins, S.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 20 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Concert MacGregor Downs, LLC. (Isenberg, Natalia)
November 28, 2018 Filing 19 Corrected Memorandum in Support regarding #18 Corrected MOTION to Remand filed by Graham Lythgoe, Kathryn Lythgoe, Charles H. Munn, Judy C. Munn, Charlotte Teichman Oehman, Robert Edward Oehman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails Oehman to Curtis, #2 Exhibit Email Lythgoe to Nanula and Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit Affidavits of Service in state court) (Collins, S.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 Corrected MOTION to Remand filed by Graham Lythgoe, Kathryn Lythgoe, Charles H. Munn, Judy C. Munn, Charlotte Teichman Oehman, Robert Edward Oehman, Jr. (Collins, S.)
November 27, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #17 Motion to Remand. Counsel has combined the motion and memorandum as one pleading. Counsel is directed to refile their Motion to Remand and Memorandum in Support as separate pleadings. See Section V.E.1(b) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 **Disregard - Corrected and refiled at #18 ** MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Graham Lythgoe, Kathryn Lythgoe, Charles H. Munn, Judy C. Munn, Charlotte Teichman Oehman, Robert Edward Oehman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails Oehman to Curtis, #2 Exhibit Email Lythgoe to Nanula and Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit Affidavits of Service in state court) (Collins, S.) Modified on 11/28/2018 (Collins, S.).
November 15, 2018 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by Natalia K. Isenberg on behalf of Concert MacGregor Downs, LLC. (Isenberg, Natalia)
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Kathryn Lythgoe. (Collins, S.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Graham Lythgoe. (Collins, S.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Judy C. Munn. (Collins, S.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Charles H. Munn. (Collins, S.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Charlotte Teichman Oehman. (Collins, S.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Robert Edward Oehman, Jr. (Collins, S.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave of Court to File In Paper Form filed by Graham Lythgoe, Kathryn Lythgoe, Charles H. Munn, Judy C. Munn, Charlotte Teichman Oehman, Robert Edward Oehman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Collins, S.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua D. Hansen on behalf of Graham Lythgoe, Kathryn Lythgoe, Charles H. Munn, Judy C. Munn, Charlotte Teichman Oehman, Robert Edward Oehman, Jr. (Collins, S.)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 12/5/18. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/31/2018. (Collins, S.)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 5:18-CV-508-FL. No further filing shall be made in 4:18-CV-175-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/26/2018. (Collins, S.)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Joshua D. Hansen of Hansen, Howell, & Wilkie, PLLC at 1618 Glenwood Ave., Raleigh, NC 27608 mailed via US Mail on October 26, 2018. (Rudd, D.)
October 26, 2018 Notice to Counsel: This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
October 26, 2018 Case transferred in from Eastern Division Division on 10/26/2018. Case Number 4:18-cv-175. (Collins, S.)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer B. Milak on behalf of Concert MacGregor Downs, LLC. (Milak, Jennifer)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Kendra N. Stark on behalf of Concert MacGregor Downs, LLC. (Stark, Kendra)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Concert MacGregor Downs, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Concert Golf Partners for Concert MacGregor Downs, LLC. (Stark, Kendra)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Concert MacGregor Downs, LLC from Wake County Superior Court, case number 18 CVS 6304. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4702000), filed by Concert MacGregor Downs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Stark, Kendra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oehman et al v. Concert MacGregor Downs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graham Lythgoe
Represented By: Joshua D. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Teichman Oehman
Represented By: Joshua D. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles H. Munn
Represented By: Joshua D. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Edward Oehman, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua D. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy C. Munn
Represented By: Joshua D. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Lythgoe
Represented By: Joshua D. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concert MacGregor Downs, LLC
Represented By: Kendra N. Stark
Represented By: Jennifer B. Milak
Represented By: Natalia K. Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?