Rogers v. Kings Bowl America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Rogers
Defendant: Kings Bowl America, LLC, Hailey Delima and Bill Sheridan
Case Number: 5:2018cv00512
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk regarding deficient summons. (Collins, S.)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kings Bowl America, LLC filed by Jonathan Rogers. (Collins, S.)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jonathan Rogers. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is granted. The district court should dismiss Defendants Delima and Sheridan from this action. Rogers's remaining discrimination claims under the ADA for hostile work environment and retaliation against Kings Bowl America can proceed. The Clerk of Court will issue the summons, and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Summons and Complaint on Kings Bowl America. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 11/30/2018. (A copy of this Order and M&R was sent via US mail to Jonathan Rogers, 7869 Knightdale Blvd., Knightdale, NC 27545.) (Collins, S.)
October 30, 2018 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Tripp, S.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Jonathan Rogers. (Rudd, D.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Jonathan Rogers. (Rudd, D.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Jonathan Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Kings Bowl America, #4 Proposed Summons Hailey Delima, #5 Proposed Summons Bill Sheridan) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Kings Bowl America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings Bowl America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hailey Delima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?