Solomon v. U.S. Navy et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Solomon
Defendant: U.S. Navy and U.S. Coast Guard
Case Number: 5:2018cv00532
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against U.S. Coast Guard, U.S. Navy filed by Patrick Solomon. (Collins, S.)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Patrick Solomon. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 12/3/2018. (A copy of this M&R was sent via US mail to Patrick Solomon, 3984 Neeley St., Raleigh, NC 27606.) (Collins, S.)
November 7, 2018 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Patrick Solomon. (Rudd, D.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Patrick Solomon (Not dated or signed). (Rudd, D.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Patrick Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. U.S. Navy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Coast Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?