Williamson v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael James Williamson
Defendant: James Michael Pratt and J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00548
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply regarding #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint - Responses due by 1/31/2019. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/8/2019. (Tripp, S.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Michael James Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time) (Ballew, Matthew)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 2/8/19. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/4/2019. (Collins, S.)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., James Michael Pratt. (Prendergast, Michelle)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike regarding #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., James Michael Pratt. (Prendergast, Michelle) Modified on 1/4/2019 to clarify docket text. (Collins, S.).
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claim regarding #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., James Michael Pratt. (Prendergast, Michelle) Modified on 1/4/2019 to clarify docket text. (Collins, S.).
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., James Michael Pratt. (Prendergast, Michelle)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Michelle Prendergast on behalf of All Defendants. (Prendergast, Michelle)
December 5, 2018 Filing 12 Certificate of Service filed by Michael James Williamson regarding #9 Notice of Appearance . (Ballew, Matthew)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Service filed by Michael James Williamson regarding #10 Financial Disclosure Statement . (Ballew, Matthew)
November 30, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #9 Notice of Appearance, #10 Financial Disclosure Statement. A Certificate of Service should accompany these filings. Counsel is directed to file the Certificates of Service using the event code titled as such located under the "Service of Process" category of civil filing events. (Collins, S.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Michael James Williamson (Ballew, Matthew)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew David Ballew on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ballew, Matthew)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. and James Michael Pratt answer due 12/21/2018. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/16/2018. (Certified copy served via U.S. Mail upon Plaintiff's counsel Robert E. Zaytoun, Matthew D. Ballew, John R. Taylor and George Podgorny, Jr. of Zaytoun Law Firm, PLLC at 3130 Fairhill Drive, Suite 100, Raleigh, NC 27512) (Tripp, S.)
November 16, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Tripp, S.)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., James Michael Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending time to respond to complaint) (Frankel, Shannon)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Robert E. Zaytoun, Matthew D. Ballew, John R. Taylor and George Podgorny, Jr. of Zaytoun Law Firm, PLLC at 3130 Fairhill Drive, Suite 100, Raleigh, NC 27512 mailed via US Mail on November 14, 2018. (Rudd, D.)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 Notice filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., James Michael Pratt regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental removal cover sheet. (Frankel, Shannon)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by James Michael Pratt (Frankel, Shannon)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., James Michael Pratt identifying Corporate Parent J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. for J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Frankel, Shannon)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Shannon Strickland Frankel on behalf of All Defendants. (Frankel, Shannon)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wake County Superior, case number 18 CVS 12332. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 0417-4725615), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit B State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Frankel, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Michael Pratt
Represented By: Shannon Strickland Frankel
Represented By: Michelle Prendergast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Strickland Frankel
Represented By: Michelle Prendergast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James Williamson
Represented By: Matthew David Ballew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?