Means v. State of Alabama et al
Petitioner: Willie Clay Means
Respondent: State of Alabama and Luther Strange
Case Number: 5:2018hc02255
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Case Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle for petition review. (Love, L.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (on proper forms) filed by Willie Clay Means. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Affidavit, #6 Envelope) (Love, L.)
October 29, 2018 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number RAL067690. (Indig, A.)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY - (1) The papers are not on the forms prescribed for use by this court; (2) The filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 10/26/2018. Copy of Order, petition form, and application to proceed without payment of fees sent via US Mail to Willie Clay Means at Butner Medium II - F.C.I. (Love, L.)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Willie Clay Means at Butner Medium II - F.C.I. (Love, L.)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Willie Clay Means. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope) (Love, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Means v. State of Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Luther Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie Clay Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?