Byrd v. Office of the N.C. Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Henry Clifford Byrd, Sr.
Defendant: Barry H. Bloch, Office of the N.C. Attorney General, NC Industrial Commission and NC Department of Insurance
Case Number: 5:2019ct03212
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Case Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for frivolity review. As soon as the screening is concluded, an order will issue and the next appropriate step will be taken. (Docket sheet mailed to plaintiff.) (Castania, M)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/1/2019. Copy to plaintiff and to NC Department of Public Safety. (Castania, M)
July 31, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. - #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Castania, M)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Henry Clifford Byrd, Sr. (Castania, M)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from plaintiff regarding trust account information. (Attachments: #1 Hyde Correctional - Request for Information, #2 Envelope) (Castania, M)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED from NC Department of Public Safety. (Castania, M)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) - Response to Order due by 8/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/19/2019. Copy to plaintiff and to NC Department of Public Safety. (Castania, M)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Henry Clifford Byrd, Sr. at Hyde Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Henry Clifford Byrd, Sr. (Indig, A.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Henry Clifford Byrd, Sr. (Indig, A.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barry H. Bloch, NC Department of Insurance, NC Industrial Commission and Office of the N.C. Attorney General filed by Henry Clifford Byrd, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Office of the N.C. Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the N.C. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Industrial Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Department of Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Clifford Byrd, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?