Sanders v. Imam et al
Plaintiff: Teddy F. Sanders
Defendant: Dr. Imam and Unknown Nurse
Case Number: 5:2019ct03240
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for complaint review. (Indig, A.)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/28/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
August 27, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/15/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Teddy F. Sanders at Greene Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Teddy F. Sanders. (Indig, A.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dr. Imam and Unknown Nurse filed by Teddy F. Sanders. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Imam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Imam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy F. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?