Williams v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: Javits Williams
Defendant: J.A. Payne, John Doe Officers and Gerald Baker
Case Number: 5:2019ct03242
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Javits Williams. Plaintiff has been released from custody, no forwarding address provided. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - that this action is hereby dismissed for failure to advise the court of his new address and for failure to prosecute. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/4/2019. Copy of judgment and notice of appellate rights sent via US Mail to Javits Williams at Wake County Detention Center. (Indig, A.)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice for failure to advise the court of his new address and for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 9/4/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Javits Williams at Wake County Detention Center. Notation on envelope states "No Longer Here." No forwarding address provided. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Javits Williams at Wake County Detention Center. Notation on envelope states "No Longer Here." No forwarding address provided. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
August 15, 2019 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for complaint review. (Indig, A.)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/15/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to plaintiff at Wake County Detention Center. (Indig, A.)
August 14, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Javits Williams at Wake County Detention Center. (Indig, A.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Javits Williams. (Indig, A.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Javits Williams. (Indig, A.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gerald Baker, John Doe Officers and J.A. Payne filed by Javits Williams. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javits Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?