Bynum v. County of Northampton et al
Plaintiff: Olander R. Bynum
Defendant: Sergeant Tim K. Spence and County of Northampton
Case Number: 5:2019ct03322
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 1/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 12/30/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Olander R. Bynum. (Attachment: #1 Document in Support) (Indig, A.)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 CORRECTED COMPLAINT (on the form) against Tim K. Spence filed by Olander R. Bynum. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Response to order due by 12/23/2019. In the event plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the clerk shall, without further order of the court, dismiss this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/9/2019. Copy served via US Mail, along with civil rights package: Olander R. Bynum 0060459, Caledonia Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 137, Tillery, NC 27887. (Castania, M)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY - Response to order due by 11/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 11/5/2019. Copy served via US Mail, along with forms, on plaintiff at Caledonia Correctional. (Castania, M)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Olander R. Bynum at Caledonia Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Northampton and Tim K. Spence filed by Olander R. Bynum. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bynum v. County of Northampton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Tim K. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Northampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olander R. Bynum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?