Butler v. Ammons
Plaintiff: Solomon Nimrod Butler
Defendant: James Floyd Ammons, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2019ct03357
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III - #7 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Castania, M)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Solomon Nimrod Butler. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/10/2020. Copy of judgment and notice of appellate rights sent via US Mail to Solomon Nimrod Butler at Scotland Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 1/10/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
January 8, 2020 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding order of deficiency. (Indig, A.)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Deficiency. The application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit is not signed. Response due by 12/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 12/4/2019. Copy of order and document sent via US Mail to plaintiff at Scotland Correctional. (Indig, A.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Solomon Nimrod Butler at Scotland Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (unsigned) to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Solomon Nimrod Butler. (Indig, A.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Floyd Ammons, Jr. filed by Solomon Nimrod Butler. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Floyd Ammons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon Nimrod Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?