United States America v. Portorreal Reyes
Plaintiff: United States America
Defendant: Carlos Jose Portorreal Reyes and Ramon Esteban Paez-Jerez
Case Number: 5:2019cv00015
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT in favor of United States America against Carlos Jose Portorreal Reyes - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/18/2019. (Tripp, S.)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT REVOKING NATURALIZATION granting #4 Joint Motion entry of consent order - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/18/2019. (Tripp, S.)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan in New Bern Courtroom: Motion Hearing held on 1/18/2019 regarding #4 Joint MOTION entry of consent order filed by United States America - Assistant U.S. Attorneys present for government - Defendant present with counsel - Court hears from the parties and defendant - Government's motion is granted - The court strikes paragraph #9 from the proposed order and directs that should defendant fail to surrender the naturalization certificate within 10 days, that the government is to inform the court - Defendant remanded to custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. (Court Reporter - Tracy McGurk) (Tripp, S.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by James B. Polk on behalf of Carlos Jose Portorreal Reyes. (Polk, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Notice filed by United States America of Service of Complaint by Email. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service by Email) (Warlick, Lori)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Carlos Jose Portorreal Reyes. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.* (Tripp, S.)
January 16, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #4 Joint MOTION entry of consent order. (Tripp, S.)
January 16, 2019 Motion No Longer Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #4 Joint MOTION entry of consent order. (Tripp, S.)
January 16, 2019 Motion No Longer Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle: regarding #4 Joint MOTION entry of consent order. (Stouch, L.)
January 16, 2019 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:19-CV-15-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/16/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
January 16, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #4 Joint MOTION entry of consent order. (Stouch, L.)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION entry of consent order filed by United States America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Warlick, Lori)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Related Case filed by United States America . (Warlick, Lori)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Lori B. Warlick on behalf of United States America. (Warlick, Lori)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Revoke Naturalization against Carlos Jose Portorreal Reyes, filed by United States America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Good Cause by Special Agent Luis Castrillon, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Warlick, Lori) Modified on 1/16/2019 to clarify docket text. (Tripp, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States America v. Portorreal Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Jose Portorreal Reyes
Represented By: James B. Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Esteban Paez-Jerez
Represented By: James B. Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States America
Represented By: Lori B. Warlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?