L&M Companies, Inc. et al v. Unique Food Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: L&M Companies, Inc. and Palumbo Foods, LLC
Defendant: Gina D. Bissette, Bissette Brothers, LLC, Louis J. Deangelis, Unique Food Company, Inc., Beverly A. Deangelis and Louis J. Deangelis, Jr.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Ford's Produce Company, Select Funding, LLC, C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc., Patterson Repack, Inc., Lipman-Texas, LLC, Nature's Way Farms, Inc., The Thomas Colace Company, Inc., D&T Brokerage, Inc., R.S. Hanline & Co., Inc., General Produce, LLC, Nickey Gregory Company, LLC and JH Honeycutt & Sons, Inc.
Interested Party: Christopher J Waivers and John C. Bircher, III
Case Number: 5:2019cv00027
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #92 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (Sellers, N.)
March 28, 2019 Filing 92 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically filed by Select Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Saintsing, Byron)
March 26, 2019 Filing 91 Intervenor COMPLAINT against Unique Food Company, Inc., Louis J. Deanglis, and Beverly A. Deangelis, filed by Select Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 2018 Merchant Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - October 2018 Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - November 2018 Merchant Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - November 2018 Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - UCC-1 Financing Statement) (Saintsing, Byron)
March 26, 2019 Filing 90 Notice of Appearance filed by Byron L. Saintsing on behalf of Select Funding, LLC. (Saintsing, Byron)
March 26, 2019 Filing 89 Declaration of PACA Proof of Claim by L&M Companies, Inc. (Goldman, Robert)
March 26, 2019 Filing 88 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ford's Produce Company (Davies, Joseph)
March 26, 2019 Filing 87 Financial Disclosure Statement by Patterson Repack, Inc. (Davies, Joseph)
March 26, 2019 Filing 86 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Patterson Repack, Inc., Ford's Produce Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Patterson Repack, Inc. Declaration and Proof of Claim, #2 Affidavit Ford's Produce Company Declaration and Proof of Claim) (Davies, Joseph)
March 26, 2019 Filing 85 Declaration of PACA Proof of Claim by Palumbo Foods, LLC (Goldman, Robert)
March 25, 2019 Filing 84 Declaration of PACA Proof of Claim by R.S. Hanline & Co., Inc. (Goldman, Robert)
March 25, 2019 Filing 83 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by R.S. Hanline & Co., Inc.. (Goldman, Robert)
March 25, 2019 Filing 82 Declaration regarding #63 Preliminary Injunction, #65 Intervenor Complaint, PACA Proof of Claim by JH Honeycutt & Sons, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PACA Trust Chart, #2 Exhibit B - PACA License Info, #3 Exhibit C - Unique's PACA License Information, #4 Exhibit D - Statement & Invoices) (Ellis, Kate)
March 25, 2019 Filing 81 Declaration regarding #63 Preliminary Injunction, #65 Intervenor Complaint, PACA Proof of Claim by Lipman-Texas, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PACA Trust Chart, #2 Exhibit B - PACA License Info, #3 Exhibit C - Unique's PACA License Information, #4 Exhibit D - Statement & Invoices) (Ellis, Kate)
March 25, 2019 Filing 80 Declaration regarding #63 Preliminary Injunction, #65 Intervenor Complaint, PACA Proof of Claim by Nature's Way Farms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PACA Trust Chart, #2 Exhibit B - PACA License Info, #3 Exhibit C - Unique's PACA License Information, #4 Exhibit D - Statement & Invoices) (Ellis, Kate)
March 25, 2019 Filing 79 Declaration regarding #63 Preliminary Injunction, #65 Intervenor Complaint, PACA Proof of Claim by Nickey Gregory Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PACA Trust Chart, #2 Exhibit B - PACA License Info, #3 Exhibit C - Unique's PACA License Information, #4 Exhibit D - Statement & Invoices) (Ellis, Kate)
March 25, 2019 Filing 78 Declaration regarding #63 Preliminary Injunction, #65 Intervenor Complaint, PACA Proof of Claim by The Thomas Colace Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PACA Trust Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Claimant's PACA License Info, #3 Exhibit C - Unique's PACA License Info, #4 Exhibit D - Statement & Invoices) (Ellis, Kate)
March 20, 2019 Filing 77 Notice filed by L&M Companies, Inc. of Release of Notice of Pending Suit. (Goldman, Robert)
March 19, 2019 Filing 76 Certificate of Service filed by John C. Bircher, III Proof of Service of Mailing of Consent Injunction on Creditors. (Bircher, John)
March 19, 2019 Filing 75 Certificate of Service filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc. regarding #74 Declaration (PACA Proof of Claim). (Akerly, Bruce)
March 19, 2019 Filing 74 Declaration regarding #63 Preliminary Injunction, #24 Intervenor Complaint (PACA Proof of Claim) by D&T Brokerage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 PACA Trust Chart, #2 Statement & Invoices) (Akerly, Bruce)
March 13, 2019 Filing 73 Declaration regarding #63 Preliminary Injunction, #66 Intervenor Complaint --PACA Proof of Claim by General Produce, LLC (Amendola, Mark)
March 13, 2019 Filing 72 Declaration regarding #63 Preliminary Injunction, #64 Intervenor Complaint --PACA Proof of Claim by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet to accrue interest, #2 Exhibit Statement of Account + Unpaid Invoices Part 1, #3 Exhibit Unpaid Invoices Part 2, #4 Exhibit PACA License, #5 Exhibit Fees and Costs Summary) (Amendola, Mark)
February 28, 2019 Filing 71 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher John Waivers on behalf of Christopher J Waivers. (Waivers, Christopher)
February 22, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #70 Notice of Appearance. Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. (Sellers, N.)
February 22, 2019 Filing 70 Notice of Appearance filed by John C. Bircher, III on behalf of John C. Bircher, III. (Bircher, John)
February 22, 2019 Filing 69 Notice of Appearance filed by John C. Bircher, III on behalf of John C. Bircher, III. (Bircher, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 68 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Mark A. Amendola on behalf of General Produce, LLC. (Amendola, Mark)
February 21, 2019 Filing 67 Financial Disclosure Statement by General Produce, LLC (Amendola, Mark)
February 21, 2019 Filing 66 Intervenor COMPLAINT Against All Defendants, filed by General Produce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Account and Unpaid Invoices) (Amendola, Mark)
February 20, 2019 Filing 65 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by JH Honeycutt & Sons, Inc., Lipman-Texas, LLC, Nickey Gregory Company, LLC, The Thomas Colace Company, Inc., Nature's Way Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Ellis, Kate)
February 19, 2019 Filing 64 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Account) (Amendola, Mark)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CONSENT INJUNCTION AND PACA CLAIMS PROCEDURE ORDER - Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/19/2019. (Sellers, N.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James C. Dever III in Raleigh: Status Hearing held on 2/19/2019. Counsel for all parties present by telephone. Court addresses #58 Consent MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by L&M Companies, Inc., Palumbo Foods, LLC. All parties consent to the proposed injunction order. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Wanda Constantino) (Sellers, N.)
February 18, 2019 Filing 61 Notice of Lis Pendens filed by L&M Companies, Inc., Palumbo Foods, LLC. (Goldman, Robert)
February 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/18/2019. (Hayes, Lyndsay)
February 18, 2019 Filing 59 Memorandum in Support regarding #57 MOTION to Intervene filed by JH Honeycutt & Sons, Inc., Lipman-Texas, LLC, Nature's Way Farms, Inc., Nickey Gregory Company, LLC, The Thomas Colace Company, Inc.. (Mize, Leslie)
February 18, 2019 Filing 58 Consent MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by L&M Companies, Inc., Palumbo Foods, LLC. (Goldman, Robert)
February 18, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Intervene filed by JH Honeycutt & Sons, Inc., Lipman-Texas, LLC, Nature's Way Farms, Inc., Nickey Gregory Company, LLC, The Thomas Colace Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint in Intervention, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Mize, Leslie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 56 Financial Disclosure Statement by Gina D. Bissette, Bissette Brothers, LLC, Beverly A. Deangelis, Louis J. Deangelis, Jr, Louis J. Deangelis, Unique Food Company, Inc. (Darer, Brian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 55 Financial Disclosure Statement by Gina D. Bissette, Bissette Brothers, LLC, Beverly A. Deangelis, Louis J. Deangelis, Jr, Louis J. Deangelis, Unique Food Company, Inc. (Darer, Brian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE to Motion regarding #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Gina D. Bissette, Bissette Brothers, LLC, Beverly A. Deangelis, Louis J. Deangelis, Jr, Louis J. Deangelis, Unique Food Company, Inc.. (Darer, Brian)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 MOTION to Convert Preliminary Injunction Hearing to a Status Conference, and to Permit All Counsel to Appear Telephonically. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/15/2019. (Sellers, N.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 52 Consent MOTION to Convert Preliminary Injunction Hearing to a Status Conference, and to Permit All Counsel to Appear Telephonically filed by L&M Companies, Inc., Palumbo Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Goldman, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Filing 51 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine G. Clodfelter on behalf of All Defendants. (Clodfelter, Catherine)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Joinder. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/15/2019. (Sellers, N.)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Hearing on February 19, 2019 at 8:30 am. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/15/2019. (Sellers, N.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 48 Proposed Order regarding #32 Amended MOTION for Joinder in Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction Without Notice Pursuant to Rule 65, Fed. R. Civ. P. by D&T Brokerage, Inc.. (Akerly, Bruce)
February 15, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Hearing on February 19, 2019 at 8:30 am regarding #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #22 Temporary Restraining Order filed by JH Honeycutt & Sons, Inc., Lipman-Texas, LLC, Nature's Way Farms, Inc., Nickey Gregory Company, LLC, The Thomas Colace Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ellis, Kate)
February 15, 2019 Filing 46 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Kate Ellis on behalf of JH Honeycutt & Sons, Inc., Lipman-Texas, LLC, Nature's Way Farms, Inc., Nickey Gregory Company, LLC, The Thomas Colace Company, Inc.. (Ellis, Kate)
February 15, 2019 Filing 45 Financial Disclosure Statement by JH Honeycutt & Sons, Inc. (Mize, Leslie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 44 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Thomas Colace Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LFC Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Parent Better Fruits & Vegetables, LLC for The Thomas Colace Company, Inc.. (Mize, Leslie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 43 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nickey Gregory Company, LLC (Mize, Leslie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 42 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nature's Way Farms, Inc. (Mize, Leslie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 41 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lipman-Texas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent LFC Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Parent Custom Pak, Inc. for Lipman-Texas, LLC. (Mize, Leslie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance filed by Leslie Lane Mize on behalf of Lipman-Texas, LLC, Nature's Way Farms, Inc., Nickey Gregory Company, LLC, The Thomas Colace Company, Inc., JH Honeycutt & Sons, Inc.. (Mize, Leslie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian David Darer on behalf of All Defendants. (Darer, Brian)
February 14, 2019 Filing 38 Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Summons Unique Food Company, Inc. filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc. served on Brian Darer of Parker Poe on February 13, 2019. (Akerly, Bruce)
February 14, 2019 Filing 37 Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Summons Louis J. Deangelis filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc. served on Brian Darer of Parker Poe on February 13, 2019. (Akerly, Bruce)
February 14, 2019 Filing 36 Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Summons Louis J. Deangelis, Jr. filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc. served on Brian Darer of Parker Poe on February 13, 2019. (Akerly, Bruce)
February 14, 2019 Filing 35 Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Summons Gina D. Bissette filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc. served on Brian Darer of Parker Poe on February 13, 2019. (Akerly, Bruce)
February 14, 2019 Filing 34 Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Summons Bissette Brothers, LLC filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc. served on Brian Darer of Parker Poe on February 13, 2019. (Akerly, Bruce)
February 14, 2019 Filing 33 Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Summons to Beverly Deangelis filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc. served on Brian Darer of Parker Poe on February 13, 2019. (Akerly, Bruce)
February 14, 2019 Filing 32 Amended MOTION for Joinder filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Homer Forsythe) (Akerly, Bruce)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction before the Honorable James C. Dever III on February 19, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. EST. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/13/2019. (Sellers, N.)
February 13, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically, #26 MOTION for Joinder In Original Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunctive Relief. (Sellers, N.)
February 13, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Akerly, Bruce)
February 13, 2019 Filing 29 Summonses Issued as to Gina D. Bissette, Bissette Brothers, LLC, Beverly A. Deangelis, Louis J. Deangelis, Jr, Louis J. Deangelis, Unique Food Company, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
February 12, 2019 Filing 28 Notice filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc. regarding #24 Intervenor Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Beverly A. Deangelis, #2 Proposed Summons Bissette Brothers, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Gina Bissette, #4 Proposed Summons Louis Deangelis, Jr, #5 Proposed Summons Louis Deangelis, #6 Proposed Summons Unique Food Company) (Dalton, Luke)
February 12, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance filed by Luke A. Dalton on behalf of D&T Brokerage, Inc.. (Dalton, Luke)
February 11, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Joinder In Original Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit -Declaration In Support) (Amendola, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Mark A. Amendola on behalf of C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Amendola, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Filing 24 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Akerly, Bruce)
February 11, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #17 MOTION to Intervene, #16 MOTION for Joinder In Motion For Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice Pursuant to Rule 65, Fed.R.Civ.P, #21 Emergency MOTION for Hearing on Motion for TRO. (Sellers, N.)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Intervene filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/8/2019. (Sellers, N.)
February 8, 2019 Set Hearing as to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before District Judge James C. Dever III. (Sellers, N.)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/8/2019. (Sellers, N.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 21 Emergency MOTION for Hearing on Motion for TRO filed by L&M Companies, Inc., Palumbo Foods, LLC. (Goldman, Robert)
February 8, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy Nerhood on behalf of C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Nerhood, Timothy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. (Nerhood, Timothy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support regarding #17 MOTION to Intervene by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Account, #2 Representative Unpaid Invoice, #3 Intervention Complaint) (Nerhood, Timothy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Intervene filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nerhood, Timothy)
February 6, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #13 Notice of Special Appearance. Local counsel must also file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2. (Sellers, N.)
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Joinder In Motion For Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice Pursuant to Rule 65, Fed.R.Civ.P filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc.. (Akerly, Bruce)
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by D&T Brokerage, Inc. (Akerly, Bruce)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Intervene (Unopposed) filed by D&T Brokerage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Akerly, Bruce)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Bruce William Akerly on behalf of D&T Brokerage, Inc.. (Akerly, Bruce)
January 31, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Sellers, N.)
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Robert E. Goldman on behalf of L&M Companies, Inc., Palumbo Foods, LLC. (Goldman, Robert)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by L&M Companies, Inc., Palumbo Foods, LLC. (Ceglowski, Kevin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by L&M Companies, Inc., Palumbo Foods, LLC. (Ceglowski, Kevin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by L&M Companies, Inc., Palumbo Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order from Senn Brothers, Inc. v. Farmin Brands, LLC, et al, #2 Exhibit TRO from Farmer's Friend, Inc. v. Unique Food Company, Inc., et al, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Michael J. McGee, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Tonino C. Palumbo, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Robert E. Goldman) (Ceglowski, Kevin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by L&M Companies, Inc., Palumbo Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Attorney Certification) (Ceglowski, Kevin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Summonses Issued as to Gina D. Bissette, Bissette Brothers, LLC, Beverly A. Deangelis, Louis J. Deangelis, Jr, Louis J. Deangelis, Unique Food Company, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
January 29, 2019 Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 01/29/2019. Old Case Number 4:19-cv-16. (Sellers, N.)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 5:19-CV-27-D. No further filing shall be made in 4:19-cv-16-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/29/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 29, 2019 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Palumbo Foods, LLC (Ceglowski, Kevin)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by L&M Companies, Inc. (Ceglowski, Kevin)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Michael Ceglowski on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ceglowski, Kevin)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice filed by L&M Companies, Inc., Palumbo Foods, LLC regarding #1 Complaint, - Proposed Summonses for Issuance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Unique Food Company, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons for Louis J. Deangelis, #3 Proposed Summons for Beverly A. Deangelis, #4 Proposed Summons for Louis J. Deangelis, Jr., #5 Proposed Summons for Gina D. Bissette, #6 for Bissette Brothers, LLC) (Ceglowski, Kevin)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4807602.), filed by L&M Companies, Inc., Palumbo Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - L&M Companies, Inc.'s Statement and Invoices, #2 Exhibit B - Palumbo Foods, LLC's Statement and Invoices, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ceglowski, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L&M Companies, Inc. et al v. Unique Food Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L&M Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Ceglowski
Represented By: Robert E. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palumbo Foods, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Ceglowski
Represented By: Robert E. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina D. Bissette
Represented By: Catherine G. Clodfelter
Represented By: Brian David Darer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bissette Brothers, LLC
Represented By: Catherine G. Clodfelter
Represented By: Brian David Darer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis J. Deangelis
Represented By: Catherine G. Clodfelter
Represented By: Brian David Darer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unique Food Company, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine G. Clodfelter
Represented By: Brian David Darer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly A. Deangelis
Represented By: Catherine G. Clodfelter
Represented By: Brian David Darer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis J. Deangelis, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine G. Clodfelter
Represented By: Brian David Darer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ford's Produce Company
Represented By: Joseph Alan Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Select Funding, LLC
Represented By: Byron L. Saintsing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Nerhood
Represented By: Mark A. Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Patterson Repack, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Alan Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lipman-Texas, LLC
Represented By: Kate Ellis
Represented By: Leslie Lane Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nature's Way Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Kate Ellis
Represented By: Leslie Lane Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: The Thomas Colace Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kate Ellis
Represented By: Leslie Lane Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: D&T Brokerage, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce William Akerly
Represented By: Luke A. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: R.S. Hanline & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: General Produce, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nickey Gregory Company, LLC
Represented By: Kate Ellis
Represented By: Leslie Lane Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: JH Honeycutt & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Kate Ellis
Represented By: Leslie Lane Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Christopher J Waivers
Represented By: Christopher John Waivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John C. Bircher, III
Represented By: John C. Bircher, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?