Beyene v. International Business Machines Corporation

Plaintiff: Tsegereda Beyene
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00030
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. This matter shall be stayed for a period of sixty (60) days from the date of entry of this Order. The time allowed for Defendant to move, serve an Answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint shall be extended to thirty (30) days after the expiration of the stay. Signed by Chief US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/20/2019. (Stouch, L.)
February 20, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #7 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Extend the Time to Move, Serve an Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Extend the Time to Move, Serve an Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Melissa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan Smith on behalf of Tsegereda Beyene. (Smith, Ryan)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Ryan Smith of Smith Law at 3737 Glenwood Avenue #100, Raleigh, NC 27612 mailed via US Mail on February 5, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
February 5, 2019 Notice to Counsel - The address information in the signature block for Caitlin Murray Goforth on the notice of removal does not match the information that the court has in its CM/ECF database. Counsel should email the updated la firm information to the clerk's office at NCED-Attorney-Update@nced.uscourts.gov. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Rudd, D.)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by International Business Machines Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Davis, Melissa)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Caitlin Murray Goforth on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Goforth, Caitlin)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Melissa R. Davis on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Davis, Melissa)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by International Business Machines Corporation from Wake County Superior Court, case number 18 CVS 015654. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4814771), filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement - Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Davis, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beyene v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tsegereda Beyene
Represented By: Ryan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Caitlin Murray Goforth
Represented By: Melissa R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?