Rags to Royals v. Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Rags to Royals
Defendant: Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. and Robin Underwood Bowden
Case Number: 5:2019cv00061
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Dismiss for lack of venue; denying without prejudice #26 Motion to Amend/Correct. This case is hereby transferred to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/22/2019. (ni) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Rags to Royals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stone Decl. (Third), #2 Exhibit Jackson Decl., #3 Exhibit Bunn Decl., #4 Exhibit Lavender Decl.)(Crandall, Rebecca) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. Replies due by 8/3/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 1.16.18 Letter, #2 Exhibit B original D27.1, #3 Exhibit C CMECF notification, #4 Exhibit D Fundraiser by Jessica Stone, #5 Exhibit E Rags To Royals Rescue Home Facebook, #6 Exhibit F Adopt A French Bulldog Adopt An English Bulldog NC Adoption, #7 Exhibit G Licorne The Frenchie Licorne The Rescued Frenchicorn, #8 Exhibit H Facebook post, #9 Exhibit I email)(Biller, Anthony) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Jamie White filed by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Temporary No Contact Order for Stalking)(Biller, Anthony) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #26 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Responses due by 7/27/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail Text of Order: The Defendants' Motion is GRANTED, and the Defendants shall have three (3) additional days, through and including July 27, 2018, to respond to the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/24/18. (LMR) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #26 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. Responses due by 8/6/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Biller, Anthony) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Rags to Royals. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint and Affidavit Declaration of Jessica Stone, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff Background, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Certificate of Registration, #4 Exhibit Defendants' Posts, #5 Exhibit Defendants' Post, #6 Exhibit Defendants' Application, #7 Exhibit Defendants' Posts, #8 Exhibit Defendants' Website, #9 Exhibit Facebook Search, #10 Exhibit Consumer Confusion, #11 Exhibit Bowden's Posts, #12 Exhibit White's Posts)(Crandall, Rebecca) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/13/2018 with correct PDF and modified text of Attachment #1) NEF Regenerated. (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Rags to Royals. Responses due by 7/24/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Crandall, Rebecca) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Venue by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. (Biller, Anthony) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Venue Reply due by 5/25/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail Text of Order: The Defendants' Motion is GRANTED, and the Defendants shall have three (3) additional days, through and including May 25, 2018, to file a reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/21/18. (LMR) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Venue by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. Responses due by 6/4/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Biller, Anthony) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Venue by Rags to Royals. Replies due by 5/22/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration - Stone, #2 Exhibit Defendants' website, #3 Exhibit Defendants' website, #4 Exhibit Defendants' website, #5 Exhibit Defendants' website, #6 Exhibit Defendants' website, #7 Exhibit Defendants' website, #8 Exhibit Defendants' Facebook, #9 Exhibit Defendants' Facebook, #10 Exhibit Defendants' Facebook, #11 Exhibit Defendants' Facebook, #12 Exhibit Defendants' Facebook, #13 Exhibit Defendants' Facebook)(Crandall, Rebecca) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Venue by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. (Biller, Anthony) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Venue by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. Responses due by 5/16/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Biller, Anthony) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
May 2, 2018 Set Deadlines: The deadline for Robin Underwood Bowden and Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. to answer/respond to the #20 amended complaint is 5/16/2018. (maf) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: Defendants' #10 and #15 Motions. Text of Order: Defendants' #10 Motion to Dismiss, and Defendants' #15 Motion for extension of time to file a reply in support of their motion to dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT in light of the filing of the #20 Amended Complaint. It is So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/2/2018. (maf) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rags to Royals, filed by Rags to Royals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's works, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's registration certificate, #3 Exhibit Defendants' posts, #4 Exhibit Defendants' post, #5 Exhibit Defendants' trademark application, #6 Exhibit Defendants' posts, #7 Exhibit Defendants' website, #8 Exhibit Facebook search results, #9 Exhibit Facebook consumer confusion)(Crandall, Rebecca) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Robin Underwood Bowden re #18 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. (Haas, Emily) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. (Haas, Emily) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Michele Haas on behalf of Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. (Haas, Emily) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 5/4/2018. (emw) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Amend/Correct, and the Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/27/18. (emw) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. Responses due by 5/10/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Biller, Anthony) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Rags to Royals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Crandall, Rebecca) Modified text on 4/26/2018 (ejb). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Rags to Royals. Responses due by 5/7/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Crandall, Rebecca) Modified text on 4/26/2018 (ejb). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue by Rags to Royals. Replies due by 4/30/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' website, #2 Exhibit Defendants' website, #3 Exhibit Defendants' website, #4 Exhibit Defendants' website, #5 Exhibit Defendants' website, #6 Exhibit Defendants' website, #7 Exhibit Defendants' Facebook, #8 Exhibit Defendants' Facebook, #9 Exhibit Defendants' Facebook, #10 Exhibit Defendants' Facebook, #11 Exhibit Defendants' Facebook)(Crandall, Rebecca) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. (Biller, Anthony) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. Responses due by 4/23/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Biller, Anthony) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of James Underwood filed by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. (Biller, Anthony) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants. Text of Order: The Defendants' Motion is GRANTED, and the Defendants shall have an additional thirty (30) days, through and including April 9, 2018, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/2/18. (LMR) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. (Biller, Anthony) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Joseph Biller on behalf of Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. (Biller, Anthony) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.1.1. (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
February 13, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc., Robin Underwood Bowden. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
February 13, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding trademark number 5,086,545 contained in #1 Complaint. (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
February 13, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
February 13, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rags to Royals (Crandall, Rebecca) Modified text on 2/13/2018 (ejb). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
February 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca E. Crandall on behalf of Rags to Royals. (Crandall, Rebecca) Modified text to change from a Motion to a Notice of Appearance and terminate as a pending motion on 2/13/2018. NEF Regenerated. (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]
February 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3594695), filed by Rags to Royals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Complaint)(Crandall, Rebecca) Modified text on 2/13/2018 (ejb). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rags to Royals v. Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rags to Royals
Represented By: Rebecca E. Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Biller
Represented By: Emily Michele Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Underwood Bowden
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Biller
Represented By: Emily Michele Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?