Brown v. Equifax Inc.

Plaintiff: Jahmal Tremaine Brown
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00078
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Reply to Motion regarding #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jahmal Tremaine Brown. (Stouch, L.)
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED defendants' motion to dismiss [DE 5] is GRANTED. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED. This case is closed. Signed by deputy clerk for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/24/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Jahmal Tremaine Brown at 5001 EverGreen Forest Way, Apt. 201, Raleigh, NC 27616. (Stouch, L.)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/23/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Jahmal Tremaine Brown at 5001 EverGreen Forest Way, Apt. 201, Raleigh, NC 27616. (Stouch, L.)
April 17, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Stouch, L.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Equifax Inc.. (Lingo, Bradley)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jahmal Tremaine Brown. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 - Dispute Letter, #3 Exhibit 2 - Transaction Report, #4 Exhibit 3 - Credit File, #5 Exhibit 4 - Retail Installment Contract, #6 Exhibit 5 - Credit Acceptance Letter, #7 Exhibit 6 - State of NC DOJ Letter, #8 Exhibit 7 - State of NC DOJ Letter, #9 Exhibit 8 - Statement of Credit Denial, #10 Exhibit 9 - Collection Letter, #11 Exhibit 10 - Equifax Credit File, #12 Exhibit 11 - State of NC DOJ Letter, #13 Exhibit 12 - Equifax Credit File, #14 Exhibit 13 - Equifax Dispute Letter, #15 Exhibit 14 - Equifax Credit File, #16 Exhibit 15 - Third Request from Equifax, #17 Exhibit 16 - Notice of Pending Litigation, #18 Exhibit 17 - Letter from Equifax, #19 Exhibit 18 - Letter in REsponse to Credit File Request, #20 Exhibit 19 - Letter from Equifax) (Stouch, L.)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Service filed by Jahmal Tremaine Brown regarding #8 Notice of Self-Representation, #9 Financial Disclosure Statement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Jahmal Tremaine Brown. (Stouch, L.)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Jahmal Tremaine Brown. (Stouch, L.)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Jahmal Tremaine Brown as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 4/1/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Jahmal Tremaine Brown at 5001 EverGreen Forest Way, Apt. 201, Raleigh, NC 27616. (Stouch, L.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support regarding #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Equifax Inc.. (Lingo, Bradley)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Equifax Inc.. (Lingo, Bradley)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Bradley Jason Lingo on behalf of Equifax Inc.. (Lingo, Bradley)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a notice of self-representation sent to plaintiff Jahmal Brown via US Mail to 5001 EverGreen Forest Way, Apt. 201, Raleigh, NC 27616. (Stouch, L.)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Stouch, L.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Equifax Inc. (Lingo, Bradley)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equifax Inc. from Wake County General Court of Justice, case number 19CV001687. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4853301), filed by Equifax Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet C - Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Lingo, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Equifax Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Jason Lingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jahmal Tremaine Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?