United States v. $33,313.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $33,313.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: James Arthur McIntyre, Bobby McIntyre and Lester Williams, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00118
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery in this case may be governed by a protective order. This case does not properly fall within a category of case automatically selected for mediation. If at any time a settlement is reached, it shall be reported immediately to this court Discovery due by 2/28/20. Motions due by 3/30/20. The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/24/19. (Collins, S.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fesak, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #20 Rule 26(f) Report (joint). Opposing counsel's electronic signature block is not provided on this document despite it being filed as a joint report. Counsel is directed to refile the pleading to include the signatures of all counsel. See Section IV.D.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #21 ** Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fesak, Matthew) Modified on 6/20/2019 (Collins, S.).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to file Discovery Plan. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/20/2019. (Collins, S.)
May 17, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Plan. (Collins, S.)
May 17, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Plan filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fesak, Matthew)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Verified Claims [Unopposed]. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/2/2019. (Collins, S.)
May 2, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #13 MOTION for Leave to File Verified Claims [Unopposed]. (Collins, S.)
May 1, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT and Verified Claim by James Arthur McIntyre (Salmon, Elisa)
May 1, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT and Verified Claim by Bobby McIntyre (Salmon, Elisa)
May 1, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT and Verified Claim by Lester Williams, Jr (Salmon, Elisa)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Verified Claims [Unopposed] filed by Bobby McIntyre, James Arthur McIntyre, Lester Williams, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Salmon, Elisa)
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 Notice filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Notification Of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fedex Proof-Of-Delivery As To Bobby McIntyre, #2 Exhibit B - Fedex Proof-Of-Delivery As To James A. McIntyre, #3 Exhibit C - Fedex Proof-Of-Delivery As To Lester Randolph Williams, Jr.) (Fesak, Matthew)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 6/3/19. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/29/2019. (Collins, S.)
April 29, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #7 Notice of Appearance. The address on the Notice of Appearance and the records of CM/ECF do not match. Counsel should refer to Pages 5 and 6 of the CM/ECF User's Manual for instructions on updating law firm information. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Collins, S.)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lester Williams, Jr (Salmon, Elisa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by James Arthur McIntyre (Salmon, Elisa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Bobby McIntyre (Salmon, Elisa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Elisa Cyre Salmon on behalf of Bobby McIntyre, James Arthur McIntyre, Lester Williams, Jr. (Salmon, Elisa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses of Claimants by Lester Williams, Jr, James Arthur McIntyre, Bobby McIntyre. (Salmon, Elisa)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on $33,313.00 in U.S. Currency on 3/26/19. (Collins, S.)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT of Arrest and Notice In Rem issued. (Collins, S.)
March 22, 2019 Remark - Notice #3 referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court, for consideration. (Collins, S.)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest filed by United States . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fesak, Matthew)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Lee Fesak on behalf of United States. (Fesak, Matthew)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against $33,313.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sean D. Stewart, Task Force Officer Drug Enforcement Administration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fesak, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. $33,313.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $33,313.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Arthur McIntyre
Represented By: Elisa Cyre Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bobby McIntyre
Represented By: Elisa Cyre Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lester Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Elisa Cyre Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?