Clark III v. Esper
Plaintiff: Herbert Clark III
Defendant: Mark T. Esper
Case Number: 5:2019cv00184
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Notice Proposed Summons Barr filed by Herbert Clark III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Higdon, #2 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
May 20, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Herbert Clark III. (Attachments: #1 Application to proceed in forma pauperis, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed summons, #4 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Herbert Clark III. (Collins, S.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Herbert Clark III. (Collins, S.)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/16/2019. (A certified copy of this Order and blank forms was sent via US mail to Herbert Clark III, P.O. Box 26141, Fayetteville, NC 28314.) (Collins, S.)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Memorandum in Support regarding #1 Complaint (Plaintiff's Independent Action) filed by Herbert Clark III. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A- Report to suspend favorable personnel actions, #2 Appendix B- Memorandum for record dated 7/9/2010, #3 Appendix C- Army Regulation 20-10, #4 Appendix D- Memorandum for CSM 3-321 FA (pages 3, 4 and 5 contain personnel identifiers), #5 Appendix E- Enlisted Record Brief, #6 Appendix F- Appointment as Investigating Officer dated 2/28/13, #7 Appendix G- Copy of email dated 3/21/2013, #8 Appendix H- Commander's Inquiry Findings and Recommendations dated 4/3/2013, #9 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Plaintiff's Independent Action) against Mark T. Esper (No Filing fee paid), filed by Herbert Clark III. (Rudd, D.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2019: #1 Cover letter) (Rudd, D.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark III v. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Clark III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?