Gibson v. Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sharon Gibson
Defendant: Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00214
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #12 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss. (Stouch, L.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #12 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Response In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, Pursuant To Rule 41(a)(2) Of The FRCP filed by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.. (Jenkins, Amy)
June 17, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Counsel failed to file the motion using a motion event. Case manager has corrected the docket entry to show a pending motion. No action needed from counsel. (Stouch, L.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss filed by Sharon Gibson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hairston, James) Modified on 6/17/2019 to correct the docket entry text to reflect the filing is a motion (Stouch, L.).
June 13, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #5 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss By Defendant Urban Ministries of Wake County, Inc. and #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (Stouch, L.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 Notice filed by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc. regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Acknowledgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Jenkins, Amy)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sharon Gibson (Hairston, James)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by James E. Hairston, Jr on behalf of Sharon Gibson. (Hairston, James)
May 21, 2019 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Chief United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:19-CV-214-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/21/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.. (Jenkins, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Financial Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice of Appearance, #4 Answer to Complaint, #5 Motion to Dismiss, #6 Memorandum in Support - All documents referenced in the certificate of service as being served on opposing party via CM/ECF have not been served through the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing system (CM/ECF) due to the fact that plaintiff's counsel has not made an appearance in the case that has been removed to Federal Court. (Rudd, D.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel James E. Hairston, Jr. of Hairston Lane, P.A. at 434 Fayetteville Street, Suite 2350, Raleigh, NC 27601 mailed vis US Mail on May 20, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support regarding #5 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss By Defendant Urban Ministries of Wake County, Inc. filed by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.. (Jenkins, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss By Defendant Urban Ministries of Wake County, Inc. filed by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.. (Jenkins, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc. (Jenkins, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Amy Jenkins on behalf of Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.. (Jenkins, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc. (Jenkins, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc. from Wake County Superior Court, case number 18-CVS-011880. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4951726), filed by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filling Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Jenkins, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Gibson
Represented By: James E. Hairston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?