Young v. Carter et al
Plaintiff: Shelia Denise Young
Defendant: Beam Brothers, LLC No.1, Cross Keys Leasing Co., Inc., Beam Brothers Holding Corp., Inc., Gerald Wayne Beam, Garland Crawford Beam, Shaun Crawford Beam, James Corwin Carter, Beam Brothers, LLC No.2 and Nickolas Gene Kozel
Case Number: 5:2019cv00218
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 27 Memorandum in Support regarding #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Garland C. Beam, Gerald W. Beam, Shaun C. Beam, Nickolas Kozel. (Hanley, Andrew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Garland C. Beam, Gerald W. Beam, Shaun C. Beam, Nickolas Kozel. (Hanley, Andrew)
July 1, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting the unopposed Motions for Extension of Time filed by Defendants Garland C. Beam, Gerald W. Beam, Shaun C. Beam, and Nickolas Kozel #22 #23 #24 #25 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that these defendants have up to and including July 22, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/1/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
July 1, 2019 Motions Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Rudd, D.) Modified on 7/1/2019 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nickolas Kozel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hanley, Andrew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Shaun C. Beam. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hanley, Andrew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Gerald W. Beam. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hanley, Andrew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Garland C. Beam. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hanley, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Pursuant to Rule 6.1 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure, all motions for an extension of time must show good cause, prior consultation with opposing counsel and the views of opposing counsel. Counsel is directed to refile. (Collins, S.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Shaun C. Beam. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hanley, Andrew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Garland C. Beam. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hanley, Andrew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Gerald W. Beam. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hanley, Andrew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nickolas Kozel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hanley, Andrew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by Gerald W. Beam (Hanley, Andrew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nickolas Kozel (Hanley, Andrew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Shaun C. Beam (Hanley, Andrew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Garland C. Beam (Hanley, Andrew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew J. Hanley on behalf of Garland C. Beam, Gerald W. Beam, Shaun C. Beam, Nickolas Kozel. (Hanley, Andrew)
June 18, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting the Motion for Extension of Time #6 filed by Defendants James C. Carter, Cross Keys Leasing Company, Inc., Beam Brothers Trucking, Inc., Beam Brothers Holding Corp., Inc., Beam Brothers, LLC No.1, and Beam Brothers, LLC No. 2. For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that these defendants have up to and including July 29, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/18/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by James C. Carter (Thornton, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Beam Brothers, LLC No.2 (Thornton, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Beam Brothers, LLC No.1 (Thornton, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Beam Brothers Holding Corp., Inc. (Thornton, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Cross Keys Leasing Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Beam Brothers Holding Co for Cross Keys Leasing Co., Inc.. (Thornton, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Beam Brothers Trucking, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Beam Brothers Holding Co for Beam Brothers Trucking, Inc.. (Thornton, James)
June 14, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint,,, filed by Beam Brothers Holding Corp., Inc., Beam Brothers Trucking, Inc., Beam Brothers, LLC No.1, Beam Brothers, LLC No.2, James C. Carter, Cross Keys Leasing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time) (Thornton, James)
May 31, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Garland Crawford Beam, Gerald Wayne Beam, Shaun Crawford Beam, Beam Brothers Holding Corp., Inc., Beam Brothers Trucking, Inc., Beam Brothers, LLC No.1, Beam Brothers, LLC No.2, James Corwin Carter, Cross Keys Leasing Co., Inc., Nickolas Gene Kozel. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel J. Randall, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Randall, Samuel)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan David Stump on behalf of Shelia Denise Young. (Stump, Ryan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Shelia Denise Young (Stump, Ryan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4958827.), filed by Shelia Denise Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Accident Report, #2 Exhibit NC Gen Statutes, #3 Exhibit Indictment, #4 Exhibit Gerald Beam Statement of Facts, #5 Exhibit Garland Beam Statement of Facts, #6 Exhibit Shaun Beam Statement of Facts, #7 Exhibit Nickolas Kozel Statement of Facts, #8 Exhibit Beam Bros Trucking Statement of Facts, #9 Exhibit Gerald Beam Plea Agreement, #10 Exhibit Garland Beam Plea Agreement, #11 Exhibit Shaun Beam Plea Agreement, #12 Exhibit Nickolas Kozel Plea Agreement, #13 Exhibit Beam Bros. Trucking Plea Agreement, #14 Exhibit Government Sentencing Memorandum, #15 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Proposed Summons Proposed Summonses) (Stump, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beam Brothers, LLC No.1
Represented By: James C. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Keys Leasing Co., Inc.
Represented By: James C. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beam Brothers Holding Corp., Inc.
Represented By: James C. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Wayne Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garland Crawford Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Crawford Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Corwin Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beam Brothers, LLC No.2
Represented By: James C. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nickolas Gene Kozel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Denise Young
Represented By: Ryan David Stump
Represented By: Samuel J. Randall, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?