Ascenzo v. Nielsen
Plaintiff: Juliann Ascenzo
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Case Number: 5:2019cv00219
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Juliann Ascenzo on May 29, 2019. (Collins, S.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk to Juliann Ascenzo regarding issuance of summons. (Collins, S.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Kirstjen M. Nielsen. (Collins, S.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk to Juliann Ascenzo regarding Text Order entered this date. (Collins, S.)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - This matter comes before the court on its own initiative. The clerk is DIRECTED to issue summons in this case. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), the court EXTENDS the time in which plaintiff may serve defendant. Plaintiff has 90 days from the date of this order to perfect service. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/29/2019. (Collins, S.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 Notice to Pro Se Parties Regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. The parties should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina. Case Number 2:19-cv-00852. transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail to Juliann Ascenzo, 9305 Pine Trail Lane, Summerville, SC 29486 (sshe, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/28/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND OPINION RULING ON #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION The Court ADOPTS the R & R (Dkt. No. 11) of Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald as the Order of the Court and TRANSFERS this action to the District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/24/2019. (sshe, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/28/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the district court transfer the instant matter to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina for all further proceedings. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 5/13/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 4/29/19. (ctuc, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/28/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Interrogatories from Juliann Ascenzo (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/28/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Juliann Ascenzo with interrogatories (kric, ) Modified on 3/28/2019 to edit text (kric, ). [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/28/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER The plaintiff is directed to answer the Court's Special Interrogatory that is attached to this order then sign, date, and return the Special Interrogatory to the Clerk of Court by 4/18/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 3/28/19. (Attachments: #1 Court's interrogatory)(ctuc, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/28/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juliann Ascenzo ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 70975) filed by Juliann Ascenzo. Service due by 6/18/2019.(jtho, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ascenzo v. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliann Ascenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?