Borsellino v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Samuel Borsellino
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00232
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Samuel Borsellino as to Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Krueger, William)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 7/30/19. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/25/19. (Collins, S.)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #8 Notice of Appearance. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Collins, S.)
June 24, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #8 Notice of Appearance, #9 Notice of Appearance. Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (Collins, S.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Samuel Borsellino (Krueger, William)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by William K. Krueger, Jr on behalf of Samuel Borsellino. (Krueger, William) (Main Document 9 flattened and replaced on 7/17/2019) (Edwards, S.).
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by William K. Krueger, Jr on behalf of Samuel Borsellino. (Krueger, William) (Main Document 8 flattened and replaced on 7/17/2019) (Edwards, S.).
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support regarding #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law) (Brown, R.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Brown, R.)
June 7, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Laurie B. Gengo, Triangle Law Group, 3130 Fairhill Drive, Ste. 104, Raleigh, NC 27612. (Collins, S.)
June 7, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Financial Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice of Appearance. Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal, from Wake County Superior Court Case No. 19 CVS 004984. (Brown, R.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by R. Scott Brown on behalf of Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Brown, R.) (Main Document 3 flattened and replaced on 6/7/2019) (Edwards, S.).
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nationwide General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide for Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Brown, R.) (Main Document 2 flattened and replaced on 6/7/2019) (Edwards, S.).
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide General Insurance Company from Wake County Superior Court, case number 19 CVS 004984. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4974040), filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1. State Court Pleadings and Service of Process Documents) (Brown, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borsellino v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Borsellino
Represented By: William K. Krueger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: R. Scott Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?