Prime Communications, L.P. v. Ragsdale Liggett, P.L.L.C.

Plaintiff: Prime Communications, L.P.
Defendant: Ragsdale Liggett, PLLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00238
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 34 Notice to Parties regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern. Case Number 4:19-cv-00291. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #23 MOTION to Dismiss, denying as moot #27 MOTION to Abate. This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina, Western Division. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #27 MOTION to Abate filed by Ragsdale Liggett, P.L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lanza, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #23 MOTION to Dismiss #22 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Prime Communications, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue)(Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 29 Opposed RESPONSE to #23 MOTION to Dismiss #22 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Prime Communications, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Declaration of Faisal Charania, #2 Exhibit B--Malpractice Release Agreement, #3 Exhibit C--Faisal Charania Email Chain, #4 Exhibit D--Ragsdale Letter to Insurance Company, #5 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue, #6 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss)(Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #23 MOTION to Dismiss #22 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Prime Communications, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss)(Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Abate by Prime Communications, L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Schmella Email, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Abate)(Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2019. Pltf Expert Report due by 11/1/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 12/2/2019. Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/7/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/6/2020. Docket Call set for 3/13/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference held. Appearances: Stu Schrrella for Defendant. Ashish Mahendru. Ct Reporter: M. Malone. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 24 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Ragsdale Liggett, P.L.L.C., filed.(Lanza, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss #22 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. ( Motion Docket Date 4/11/2019.), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ragsdale Liggett, P.L.L.C., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Lanza, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ragsdale Liggett, P.L.L.C. filed by Prime Communications, L.P.. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue re: #14 Response to Motion,, filed.(Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER Denying Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: #13 Response to Motion, filed.(Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER Denying Defendant's Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss re: #15 Response to Motion,, filed.(Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Prime Communications, L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Amended Complaint)(Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER striking #12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Prime Communications, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Declaration of Faisal Charania, #2 Exhibit B--Malpractice Release Agreement, #3 Exhibit C--Faisal Charania Email Chain, #4 Exhibit D--Ragsdale Letter to Insurance Company)(Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Prime Communications, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Declaration of Faisal Charania, #2 Exhibit B--Malpractice Release Agreement, #3 Exhibit C--Faisal Charania Email Chain, #4 Errata D--Ragsdale Letter to Insurance Company)(Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Prime Communications, L.P.. (Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Prime Communications, L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Responses to #3 Motion to Dismiss due by 3/4/2019. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re: Extension of Time by Prime Communications, L.P., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation on Extension of Time)(Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Prime Communications, L.P., filed.(Mahendru, Ashish) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Ragsdale Liggett, P.L.L.C., filed.(Lanza, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ragsdale Liggett, P.L.L.C., filed.(Lanza, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ragsdale Liggett, P.L.L.C., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lanza, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ragsdale Liggett, P.L.L.C., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Lanza, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support re: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ragsdale Liggett, P.L.L.C., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Lanza, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ragsdale Liggett, P.L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/25/2019. (Lanza, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 11th Judicial District, case number 2018-88552 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21738196) filed by Ragsdale Liggett, P.L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Index of Matters Filed, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Lanza, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime Communications, L.P. v. Ragsdale Liggett, P.L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Communications, L.P.
Represented By: Darren Andrew Braun
Represented By: Ashish Mahendru
Represented By: Darren A. Braun
Represented By: John M. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ragsdale Liggett, PLLC
Represented By: Nicholas J Lanza
Represented By: Patricia P. Shields
Represented By: Joshua D. Neighbors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?