Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company v. Odeh et al
Plaintiff: Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company
Defendant: Mayson Enterprises, LLC and Mohammed Hasan Odeh
Case Number: 5:2019cv00239
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Motion Submitted to Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard regarding #6 MOTION for Exemption from Selection for Mediation, #8 MOTION for Mediation. (Rudd, D.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default by the Clerk as to defendants Mohammed Hasan Odeh and Mayson Enterprises, LLC, filed by Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Returns of Service and Affidavits of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Savrin, Philip) Modified on 8/6/2019 to include name of parties as listed within the motion that it relates to. (Edwards, S.)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #8 MOTION for Mediation filed by Mayson Enterprises, LLC, Mohammed Hasan Odeh. (Rudd, D.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #8 MOTION for Mediation filed by Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proofs of Service) (Savrin, Philip)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Order regarding #6 MOTION for Exemption from Selection for Mediation filed by Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company. (Savrin, Philip)
June 27, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #6 Motion for Exemption from Selection for Mediation. At the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. Additionally, the judge's practice preferences MAY require counsel to email the proposed order in a word processing format. (Rudd, D.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Exemption from Selection for Mediation filed by Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company. (Savrin, Philip)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Mediation filed by Mayson Enterprises, LLC, Mohammed Hasan Odeh. (Rudd, D.)
June 17, 2019 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Senior United States District Judge Malcolm J. Howard for all further proceedings. United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:19-CV-239-H. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/17/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
June 13, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by James R. Hubbard on behalf of Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company. (Hubbard, James)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mayson Enterprises, LLC, Mohammed Hasan Odeh. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
June 12, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Philip W. Savrin on behalf of Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company. (Savrin, Philip)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Argonaut Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Argo Group US, Inc. for Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company. (Savrin, Philip)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mohammed Hasan Odeh and Mayson Enterprises, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4979658), filed by Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - GEICO Letter of April 6, 2017, #2 Exhibit B - Release, #3 Exhibit C - North Carolina DVM Title, #4 Exhibit D - AMIC's Letter of May 17, 2019, #5 Exhibit E - Policy, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Savrin, Philip) Modified on 6/12/2019 to reflect who the filing was against.(Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company v. Odeh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company
Represented By: James R. Hubbard
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayson Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Hasan Odeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?