El-Khachib v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nouri El-Khachib
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Applied Bank
Case Number: 5:2019cv00273
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Applied Bank's Motion for Extension of Time #7 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including September 3, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/31/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
July 31, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Rudd, D.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Caren D. Enloe on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Enloe, Caren)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Applied Bank (DeFrank, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Dean DeFrank on behalf of Applied Bank. (DeFrank, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Applied Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (DeFrank, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Enloe, Caren)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Enloe, Caren)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nouri El-Khachib (Edwards, Asa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Asa Covington Edwards, IV on behalf of Nouri El-Khachib. (Edwards, Asa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Applied Bank, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
July 2, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Nouri El-Khachib. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5004785.), filed by Nouri El-Khachib. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons as to Applied Bank) (Edwards, Asa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El-Khachib v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nouri El-Khachib
Represented By: Asa Covington Edwards, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Caren D. Enloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Bank
Represented By: Michael Dean DeFrank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?