Yeh v. North Carolina State University et al
Plaintiff: Wen Chiann Yeh
Defendant: Nora F. Sullivan and North Carolina State University
Case Number: 5:2019cv00279
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #14 MOTION for Default Judgment. (Sellers, N.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #14 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Wen Chiann Yeh. (Sellers, N.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by North Carolina State University, Nora F. Sullivan. (Padget, Zachary)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Wen Chiann Yeh. (Sellers, N.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Wen Chiann Yeh served on Nora Sullivan and North Carolina State University on 7/12/2019 and 7/14/2019, respectively. (Sellers, N.)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nora F. Sullivan (Padget, Zachary)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by North Carolina State University (Padget, Zachary)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Nora F. Sullivan. Nora F. Sullivan waiver sent on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Padget, Zachary)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by North Carolina State University. North Carolina State University waiver sent on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Padget, Zachary)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Zachary Padget on behalf of All Defendants. (Padget, Zachary)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER. At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is reassigned to the Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 5:19-CV-279-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/8/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Wen Chiann Yeh, 102 EcKlin Lane, Cary, NC 27519.) (Collins, S.)
July 3, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL072697. (Agiovlassitis, J.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to North Carolina State University, Nora F. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of a Summons) Issued at Raleigh intake. (Rudd, D.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Wen Chiann Yeh. (Rudd, D.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Wen Chiann Yeh. (Rudd, D.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North Carolina State University, Nora F. Sullivan (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Wen Chiann Yeh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination and Notice of Suit Rights, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of a Lawsuit and a Request to Waive Service of a Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeh v. North Carolina State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nora F. Sullivan
Represented By: Zachary Padget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina State University
Represented By: Zachary Padget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wen Chiann Yeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?