Futch v. Saul
Plaintiff: Thomas Futch
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv00286
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Commissioner of Social Security, Office of Program Law, Office of the General Counsel on 8/2/2019. (Sellers, N.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney General on 8/6/2019. (Sellers, N.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to Andrew Saul served on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Sellers, N.)
July 30, 2019 Remark: Certified copy of #6 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Sellers, N.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Summonses Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Sellers, N.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Thomas Futch. (Sellers, N.)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/29/2019. (Sellers, N.)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Notice filed by Thomas Futch regarding #1 Complaint, Notice to Counsel, . (Attachments: #1 OGC, #2 US Attorney General) (Piemonte, George)
July 11, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
July 11, 2019 Notice to Counsel - There were no USM-285 Forms filed. Please complete and file these forms for each entity that needs to be served. Counsel can file these forms using the 'Notice-other' event found in the 'Notices' category. (Sellers, N.)
July 11, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. In the future, when opening a case, the Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis should be filed as the first docket entry and should have the complaint, civil cover sheet, proposed summonses, and USM-285 Forms attached. No need to re-file at this time. (Sellers, N.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Thomas Futch (Piemonte, George)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by George C. Piemonte on behalf of Thomas Futch. (Piemonte, George)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Thomas Futch. (Piemonte, George)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Thomas Futch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons summons(combined)) (Piemonte, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Futch v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Futch
Represented By: George C. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?