United States of America v. Craft
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Stanley A. Craft
Case Number: 5:2019cv00287
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #5 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including September 16, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/22/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
August 22, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Stanley A. Craft. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ostrander, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Stanley A. Craft served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Choksi, Kunal)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stanley A. Craft. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kunal J. Choksi on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Choksi, Kunal)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stanley A. Craft, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Choksi, Kunal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley A. Craft
Represented By: Michael A. Ostrander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kunal J. Choksi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?