Under Armour, Inc. v. Battle Fashions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Under Armour, Inc.
Defendant: Battle Fashions, Inc. and Kelsey Battle
Case Number: 5:2019cv00297
Filed: July 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 111 Notice of Related Case filed by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle . (Dagger, Kelly)
July 19, 2019 Filing 110 Notice of Appearance filed by Kelly Margolis Dagger on behalf of Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle. (Dagger, Kelly)
July 19, 2019 Filing 109 Notice of Appearance filed by Leslie C. Packer on behalf of Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle. (Packer, Leslie)
July 19, 2019 Filing 108 Notice to Parties regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
July 19, 2019 Filing 107 Case transferred in from District of Maryland. Case Number 1:17-cv-03223. transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting in part #51 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment; Case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina; denying #65 and #66 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/18/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/18/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 104 EXHIBIT LIST by Under Armour, Inc. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 103 Stipulation re: Return of exhibits to Counsel. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 102 EXHIBIT LIST by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 101 EXHIBIT LIST by Under Armour, Inc. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 100 Motion Hearing held on 7/10/2019 re #51 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Kelsey Battle, Battle Fashions, Inc. before Judge Richard D. Bennett.(Court Reporter: Christine Asif) (sd3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 99 Proposed Exhibit List Plaintiff's Exhibit List for Motions Hearing by Under Armour, Inc... (Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 98 Proposed Exhibit List Defendants' Exhibit List for Motions Hearing by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle.. (Tucker, Conor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Telephone Conference re Discovery Dispute held on 1/3/2019 before Judge Richard D. Bennett. (Not on the record) (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #94 Motion of plaintiff for Leave to File a Response to Defendant's Evidentiary Objections; Granting defendants' request to seek limited discovery from Brazen Animation, Inc.; Amending Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/3/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 96 Correspondence re: January 3, 2019, Discovery Conference (Tucker, Conor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 95 Correspondence re: Discovery Dispute Conference (Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to File UA's Response to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections in the Form of a Surreply by Under Armour, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Leave to File Objections to Late-Filed Evidence filed by Kelsey Battle, Battle Fashions, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/13/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 92 RESPONSE re #85 Reply to Response to Motion,,,, #87 Reply to Response to Motion,,,, Motion for Leave to File Objections to Late-Filed Evidence filed by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Defendants' Objections to Late-Filed Evidence Presented by Under Armour in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment))(Tucker, Conor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER regarding #89 RESPONSE re #85 Reply to Response to Motion, #87 Reply to Response to Motion,Defendants' Objections to Late-Filed Evidence filed by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/4/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 90 Correspondence re: Subsequently-Decided Authority to Defts' Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment (Paper Nos. 52, 56, 63) (Tucker, Conor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 89 FILED IN ERROR - RESPONSE re #85 Reply to Response to Motion,,,, #87 Reply to Response to Motion,,,, Defendants' Objections to Late-Filed Evidence filed by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle.(Tucker, Conor) Modified on 12/4/2018 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Sealing Portions of the Record. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/27/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement REDACTED VERSION filed by Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Reply Declaration of Meaghan H. Kent, #2 Exhibit 76 (Part 1), #3 Exhibit 76 (Part 2), #4 Exhibit 77 (Part 1), #5 Exhibit 77 (Part 2), #6 Exhibit 77 (Part 3), #7 Exhibit 77 (Part 4), #8 Exhibit 77 (Part 5), #9 Exhibit 77 (Part 6), #10 Exhibit 78, #11 Exhibit 79, #12 Exhibit 80, #13 Exhibit 81, #14 Exhibit 82, #15 Exhibit 83, #16 Exhibit 84, #17 Exhibit 85, #18 Exhibit 86(A), #19 Exhibit 86(B), #20 Exhibit 86(C), #21 Exhibit 86(D), #22 Exhibit 87, #23 Exhibit 88, #24 Exhibit 89, #25 Exhibit 90, #26 Exhibit 91, #27 Exhibit 92, #28 Affidavit Declaration of Claire M. Wheeler, Appendix A, #29 Exhibit 93, #30 Exhibit 94, #31 Exhibit 95, #32 Affidavit Declaration of Lorin Hamlin, #33 Affidavit Declaration of Alexandra Bradley, #34 Affidavit Declaration of Justin Marcus Brown, #35 Attachment UA Reply Exhibit List)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 86 MOTION to Seal UA's Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Under Armour, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 85 -SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion re #72 Corrected MOTION to Amend/Correct #71 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement filed by Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Reply Declaration of Meaghan H. Kent, #2 Exhibit 76 (Part 1), #3 Exhibit 76 (Part 2), #4 Exhibit 77 (Part 1), #5 Exhibit 77 (Part 2), #6 Exhibit 77 (Part 3), #7 Exhibit 77 (Part 4), #8 Exhibit 78, #9 Exhibit 79, #10 Exhibit 80, #11 Exhibit 81, #12 Exhibit 82, #13 Exhibit 83, #14 Exhibit 84, #15 Exhibit 85, #16 Exhibit 86 (A), #17 Exhibit 86 (B), #18 Exhibit 86 (C), #19 Exhibit 86 (D), #20 Exhibit 87, #21 Exhibit 88, #22 Exhibit 89, #23 Exhibit 90, #24 Exhibit 91, #25 Exhibit 92, #26 Affidavit Declaration of Claire M. Wheeler, Appendix A, #27 Exhibit 93, #28 Exhibit 94, #29 Exhibit 95, #30 Affidavit Declaration of Lorin Hamlin, #31 Affidavit Declaration of Alexandra Bradley, #32 Affidavit Declaration of Justin Marcus Brown, #33 Attachment UA Reply Brief Exhibit List)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher no longer assigned to case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Settlement Conference held on 11/15/2018 before Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher. (cags, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Telephone Conference re: settlement held on 11/14/2018 before Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher. (cags, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion of defendant to Seal Portions of the Record. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/13/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 10, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION to Seal by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Defendants' Motion to Seal Portions of their Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Kelsey Battle, and Declaration of Conor Tucker (and Exhibits), #2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED Order SealingDefendants' Motion to Seal Portions of their Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Kelsey Battle, and Declaration of Conor Tucker (and Exhibits))(Tucker, Conor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 82 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition; Declaration of Kelsey Battle; Declaration of Conor Tucker (and Exhibits) by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle re #81 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment #1 (SEALED Memorandum in Opposition to Under Armour's Motion for Summary Judgment), #2 Affidavit Attachment #2 (SEALED Declaration of Kelsey Battle), #3 Exhibit Attachment #3 (Tucker Decl. and SEALED Exhibit 1 ; Exhibit 2; SEALED Exhibit 3 ; SEALED Exhibit 4 ; SEALED Exhibit 5; SEALED Exhibit 6; SEALED Exhibit 7), #4 Exhibit Attachment #4 (Exhibit 8; Exhibit 9; Exhibit 10; Exhibit 11), #5 Exhibit Attachment #5 (Exhibit 12), #6 Exhibit Attachment #6 (SEALED Exhibit 13; SEALED Exhibit 15; SEALED Exhibit 16; SEALED Exhibit 17; SEALED Exhibit 18; SEALED Exhibit 19; SEALED Exhibit 20; SEALED Exhibit 21), #7 Exhibit Attachment #7 (SEALED Exhibit 22; SEALED Exhibit 23; SEALED Exhibit 24; Exhibit 25; Exhibit 26; Exhibit 27; Exhibit 28; SEALED Exhibit 29; SEALED Exhibit 30; Exhibit 31), #8 Exhibit Attachment #8 (SEALED Exhibit 32), #9 Exhibit Attachment #9 (SEALED Exhibit 33), #10 Exhibit Attachment #10 (SEALED Exhibit 34; SEALED Exhibit 35; SEALED Exhibit 36; Exhibit 37; SEALED Exhibit 38; SEALED Exhibit 39; SEALED Exhibit 40; SEALED Exhibit 41; SEALED Exhibit 42.))(Tucker, Conor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement REDACTED Opposition filed by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit REDACTED Declaration of Kelsey Battle, #2 Exhibit Attachment #1 (Tucker Decl. and REDACTED Exhibit 1 ; Exhibit 2; REDACTED Exhibit 3 ; REDACTED Exhibit 4 ; REDACTED Exhibit 5; REDACTED Exhibit 6; REDACTED Exhibit 7; Exhibit 8; Exhibit 9; Exhibit 10; Exhibit 11), #3 Exhibit Attachment #2 (Exhibit 12; REDACTED Exhibit 13; REDACTED Exhibit 15; REDACTED Exhibit 16; REDACTED Exhibit 17; REDACTED Exhibit 18; REDACTED Exhibit 19; REDACTED Exhibit 20; REDACTED Exhibit 21; REDACTED Exhibit 22; REDACTED Exhibit 23; REDACTED Exhibit 24; Exhibit 25; Exhibit 26; Exhibit 27; Exhibit 28; REDACTED Exhibit 29; REDACTED Exhibit 30; Exhibit 31; REDACTED Exhibit 32; REDACTED Exhibit 33; REDACTED Exhibit 34; REDACTED Exhibit 35; REDACTED Exhibit 36; Exhibit 37; REDACTED Exhibit 38; REDACTED Exhibit 39; REDACTED Exhibit 40; REDACTED Exhibit 41; REDACTED Exhibit 42.))(Tucker, Conor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Telephone Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 11/9/2018 before Judge Richard D. Bennett. (Not on the record) (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re teleconference. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/9/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Seal November 7, 2018 letter to Judge Bennett by Under Armour, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/8/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 78 MOTION to Seal November 7, 2018 letter to Judge Bennett by Under Armour, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Redacted version of sealed November 7, 2018 letter to Judge Bennett, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 77 Correspondence re: Parties' Discovery Dispute (Tucker, Conor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 76 Sealed Correspondence (Colaizzi, Roger) Modified on 11/8/2018 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #73 Motion of Plaintiff to Seal Portions of the Record. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/29/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
October 27, 2018 Filing 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement by Under Armour, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support REDACTED VERSION, #2 Attachment, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit REDACTED, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit REDACTED, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit REDACTED, #61 Exhibit REDACTED, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit REDACTED Part 01, #77 Exhibit REDACTED Part 02, #78 Exhibit REDACTED Part 03, #79 Exhibit REDACTED Part 03, #80 Exhibit)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
October 27, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION to Seal and Notice by Under Armour, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
October 27, 2018 Filing 72 -SEALED-Corrected MOTION to Amend/Correct #71 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement by Under Armour, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Declaration of Meaghan H. Kent, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit Part 01, #77 Exhibit Part 02, #78 Exhibit Part 03, #79 Exhibit Part 04, #80 Exhibit)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
October 27, 2018 Filing 71 -SEALED- MOTION for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement by Under Armour, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting #67 Motion to Seal Portions of its Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply and Certain Exhibits Thereto. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/4/2018. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 10/5/2018. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 68 RESPONSE re #65 Response in Opposition to Motion, #51 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply filed by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle.(Tucker, Conor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to Seal by Under Armour, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 66 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A (K. Herber Declaration), #3 Exhibit B (Sur-Reply), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction REDACTED VERSION filed by Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 64 (FILED IN ERROR - Refiled as ECF 66) -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Colaizzi, Roger) Modified on 10/4/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle.(Tucker, Conor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/27/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 61 STATUS REPORT Jointly filed by Under Armour, Inc.(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Sealing Portions of the Record. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/14/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MARGINAL ORDER granting #57 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Its Opposition and Certain Attachments and Exhibits. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/14/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT re #55 Response in Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Meaghan H. Kent (REDACTED VERSION) by Under Armour, Inc.(Kent, Meaghan) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Its Opposition and Certain Attachments and Exhibits by Under Armour, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 56 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Affidavit M. Kent Declaration)(Colaizzi, Roger) Modified on 9/14/2018 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [REDACTED VERSION] filed by Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1(Redacted), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4(Redacted), #6 Exhibit 5(Redacted), #7 Exhibit 6(Redacted), #8 Exhibit 7(Redacted), #9 Exhibit 8(Redacted))(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Paperless ORDER granting #53 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/31/2018. [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Record by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Victor Jih and Portions of the Memorandum in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Sealing Portions of the Record)(Tucker, Conor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 52 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal [Sealed] Memorandum and [Sealed] Declaration of Victor Jih and Exhibits Attached thereto by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle re #51 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Defendants' [Sealed] Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively Summary Judgment for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Affidavit [Sealed] Declaration of Victor Jih in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Tucker, Conor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Defendants' [Redacted] Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively Summary Judgment, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Affidavit [Redacted] Declaration of Victor Jih in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Kelsey Battle in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Tucker, Conor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 50 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle, filed by Under Armour, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Redline Amended Complaint) (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MARGINAL ORDER granting #48 Consent Motion for Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/16/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 48 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Against Kelsey Battle and Battle Fashions, Inc. by Under Armour, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia Lynn Polasko on behalf of Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle (Polasko, Cynthia) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 46 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonathan Sasser. Directing attorney Jonathan Sasser to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeremy Falcone. Directing attorney Jeremy Falcone to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan D. Sasser (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7457034.) by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle(Glikin, Joshua) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy M. Falcone (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7456900.) by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle(Glikin, Joshua) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Regarding the Deposition of Wardell Stephen Curry II by Under Armour, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/13/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Regarding the Deposition of Wardell Stephen Curry II by Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
June 25, 2018 Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for for discovery dispute and scheduling a telephone conference on Tuesday, June 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/22/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 39 Correspondence re: Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Request for Immediate Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Battle's Memorandum of Additional Authorities, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Hearing, #3 Exhibit C Memorandum Opinion Denying Under Armour's Motion to Stay or Alternatively Dismiss)(Jih, Victor) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 38 Correspondence re: Plaintiff's Request for Immediate Status Conference (Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 37 ANSWER to #32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Under Armour, Inc..(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/4/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 35 STIPULATION Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material by Under Armour, Inc.(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MARGINAL ORDER granting #33 Joint Status Report and Requested Modifications to the Court's Scheduling Order filed by Kelsey Battle, Battle Fashions, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/22/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle(Glikin, Joshua) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Under Armour, Inc. by Kelsey Battle, Battle Fashions, Inc..(Glikin, Joshua) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Conor Tucker. Directing attorney Conor Tucker to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Conor Tucker (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7196897.) by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle(Glikin, Joshua) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 7/23/2018. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Letter)(jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #12 Motion of defendants to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/6/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/6/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Meaghan H Kent. Directing attorney Meaghan H Kent to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Frank Cimino. Directing attorney Frank Cimino to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 24 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Meaghan H. Kent by Under Armour, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 23 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Frank C. Cimino, Jr. by Under Armour, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 22 QC NOTICE: #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Under Armour, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 21 QC NOTICE: #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Under Armour, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Marie Wheeler on behalf of Under Armour, Inc. (Wheeler, Claire) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Meaghan H. Kent (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7180906.) by Under Armour, Inc.(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Frank C. Cimino, Jr. (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7180884.) by Under Armour, Inc.(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Forum Shopping filed by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Victor Jih, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Glikin, Joshua) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
February 12, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Forum Shopping filed by Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (UA's Use))(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Victor Jih. Directing attorney Victor Jih to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/1/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Morgan Chu. Directing attorney Morgan Chu to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/31/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Battle Fashions, Inc. (Glikin, Joshua) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Forum Shopping by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Kelsey Battle, #3 Declaration of Victor Jih, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Jih Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Glikin, Joshua) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Victor Jih (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7126180.) by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle(Glikin, Joshua) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Morgan Chu (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7126169.) by Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle(Glikin, Joshua) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Aaron Glikin on behalf of Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle (Glikin, Joshua) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Under Armour, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail, Inc., Other Affiliate Under Armour Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate UA Global Sourcing Limited, Other Affiliate UA China Sourcing Limited Guangzhou, Other Affiliate UA China Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate UA China Investments Limited, Other Affiliate UA China Capital Limited, Other Affiliate Under Armour Trading (Shanghai) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate UA Sourcing CBT, Other Affiliate UA Hull Street, LLC, Other Affiliate UA Hull Street II, LLC, Other Affiliate UA Locust Point Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate UA Sourcing Limited, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Arizona, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Arizona, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour UK Limited, Other Affiliate PT UA Indonesia Sourcing, Other Affiliate Under Armour Europe BV, Other Affiliate Under Armour Asia Limited, Other Affiliate Under Armour France S.a.r.l, Other Affiliate Under Armour Germany GmbH, Other Affiliate Under Armour Global Holdings, L.P., Other Affiliate Under Armour Canada, ULC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Manufacturing, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour International Holdings C.V., Other Affiliate UA China Sourcing Limited, Other Affiliate UA Cheer Parking Lot, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Japan G.K. PT, Other Affiliate Guangzhou UA Sports Product Design Limited, Other Affiliate UA Panama, S de R.L., Other Affiliate UA Brasil Comercio d Distribuicao de Artigos Esportivos Ltda., Other Affiliate Under Armour Mexico Services S. de R.L. de C.V., Other Affiliate Under Armour Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Other Affiliate UA Australia PTY LTD, Other Affiliate UA Chile SpA, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Alabama, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Alabama, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of California, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Colorado, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Connecticut, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of DC, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Delaware, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Florida, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Georgia, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Idaho, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Illinois, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Indiana, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Iowa, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Kansas, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Kentucky, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Louisiana, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Maine, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Maryland, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Massachusetts, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Michigan, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Minnesota, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Mississippi, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Missouri LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Nebraska, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Nevada, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of New Hampshire, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of New Jersey, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of New Mexico, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of New York, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of North Carolina, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Ohio, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Oklahoma, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Oregon, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Pennsylvania, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of South Carolina, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Tennessee, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Texas, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Utah, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Vermont, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Virginia, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Retail of Washington, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Amour Retail of Wisconsin, LLC, Other Affiliate Under Armour Vietnam Limited, Other Affiliate UA Peru S.R.L., Other Affiliate Endomondo ApS, Other Affiliate Endomondo US LLC, Other Affiliate UA Austria GmbH, Other Affiliate UA Austria Retail GmbH, Other Affiliate UA Germany Retail GmbH, Other Affiliate UA UK Retail Limited, Other Affiliate Under Armour Ireland Limited, Other Affiliate Under Armour Netherlands Retail BV, Other Affiliate PTH Insurance Company, Other Affiliate UA Argentina S.R.L., Other Affiliate UA Belgium BVBA, Other Affiliate UA Colombia S.A.S., Other Affiliate UA Connected Fitness, Inc., Other Affiliate UA Global Sourcing Limited/Jordan, Other Affiliate UA Italy S.R.L., Other Affiliate UA Port Covington Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate UA Taiwan Limited, Other Affiliate Under Armour Europe B.V., Amsterdam, Zurich Branch, Other Affiliate Under Armour Korea Ltd., Other Affiliate Under Armour Portugal, Unipessoal LDA, Other Affiliate Under Armour Russia OOO, Other Affiliate Under Armour Spain S.L., Other Affiliate nder Armour Retail of Colorado, LLC, Other Affiliate nder Armour Retail of New York, LLC for Under Armour, Inc..(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 7 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Battle Fashions, Inc., Kelsey Battle.(jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 2, 2017 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 11/9/2017 (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Under Armour, Inc. was filed incorrectly. *****Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR - Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Under Armour, Inc. (Colaizzi, Roger) Modified on 11/2/2017 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE by Under Armour, Inc. Proposed Summons (Kelsey Battle) (Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE by Under Armour, Inc. re #1 Complaint Proposed Summons (Battle Fashions, Inc.) (Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgement of Non-Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6976655.), filed by Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Colaizzi, Roger) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Under Armour, Inc. v. Battle Fashions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Under Armour, Inc.
Represented By: Claire Marie Wheeler
Represented By: Meaghan H. Kent
Represented By: Frank C Cimino, Jr.
Represented By: Roger A. Colaizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Battle Fashions, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Glikin
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Jeremy Falcone
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Conor D. Tucker
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Represented By: Victor Jih
Represented By: Jonathan Sasser
Represented By: Cynthia Lynn Polasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey Battle
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Glikin
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Jeremy Falcone
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Conor D. Tucker
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Represented By: Victor Jih
Represented By: Jonathan Sasser
Represented By: Cynthia Lynn Polasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?