Raleigh-Durham Airport Authority v. Ward Transformer Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Raleigh-Durham Airport Authority
Defendant: The State of North Carolina, The United States Environmental Protection Agency, Ward Transformer Company, Inc., Progress Energy, Inc., The United States of America, BBC 1, LLC, Wake County Department of Tax Administration, Young Moore and Henderson, PA and Unkown Personal Representatives, Heirs and Devisees of Robert E. Ward, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00304
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ward Transformer Company, Inc.. (Ponzi, Joseph)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ward Transformer Company, Inc. answer due 9/12/2019. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 9/11/2019. (Sellers, N.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance filed by Richard J. Keshian on behalf of Raleigh-Durham Airport Authority. (Keshian, Richard)
September 9, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint). (Sellers, N.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint by BBC 1, LLC. (Tippett, Walter)
September 6, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance filed by Walter L. Tippett, Jr on behalf of BBC 1, LLC. (Tippett, Walter)
August 29, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint by The United States Environmental Protection Agency, The United States of America. (Fowler, Neal)
August 28, 2019 Filing 30 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by The State of North Carolina. (Bulleri, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 29 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ward Transformer Company, Inc. (Ponzi, Joseph)
August 13, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance filed by Michelle Prendergast on behalf of Young Moore and Henderson, PA. (Prendergast, Michelle)
August 13, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand previously filed in state court action on July 18, 2019 by Young Moore and Henderson, PA. (Prendergast, Michelle)
August 9, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint). (Sellers, N.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by Ward Transformer Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ponzi, Joseph)
August 8, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph A. Ponzi on behalf of Ward Transformer Company, Inc.. (Ponzi, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 24 Financial Disclosure Statement by Progress Energy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corporation for Progress Energy, Inc.. (Spencer, Joshua)
July 30, 2019 Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Raleigh-Durham Airport Authority (Dowdy, Joseph)
July 30, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Phillip A. Harris, Jr on behalf of Raleigh-Durham Airport Authority. (Harris, Phillip)
July 30, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Samuel Dowdy on behalf of Raleigh-Durham Airport Authority. (Dowdy, Joseph)
July 30, 2019 Filing 20 Financial Disclosure Statement by The State of North Carolina (Bulleri, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by Young Moore and Henderson, PA (Rainey, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Wake County Department of Tax Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ad valorem taxes) (Cooper, Allison)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The United States Environmental Protection Agency answer due 8/29/2019; The United States of America answer due 8/29/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/30/2019. Sent to Richard J. Keshian at KILPATRICK TOWNSEND & STOCKTON LLP 1001 West Fourth Street Winston-Salem, NC USA 27101 and Joseph S. Dowdy and Phillip A. Harris, Jr. at KILPATRICK TOWNSEND & STOCKTON LLP 4208 Six Forks Road, Suite 1400 Raleigh, N.C. 27609 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by The State of North Carolina. (Bulleri, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Elmer Bulleri on behalf of The State of North Carolina. (Bulleri, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Service filed by Wake County Department of Tax Administration regarding #11 Notice of Appearance . (Askew, Roger)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Service filed by Wake County Department of Tax Administration regarding #9 Financial Disclosure Statement . (Cooper, Allison)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Service filed by Wake County Department of Tax Administration regarding #8 Notice of Appearance . (Cooper, Allison)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Roger A. Askew on behalf of Wake County Department of Tax Administration. (Askew, Roger)
July 30, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Notice to Plaintiff's Counsel regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make Notice of Appearance. Sent to Richard J. Keshian at KILPATRICK TOWNSEND & STOCKTON LLP 1001 West Fourth Street Winston-Salem, NC USA 27101 and Joseph S. Dowdy and Phillip A. Harris, Jr. at KILPATRICK TOWNSEND & STOCKTON LLP 4208 Six Forks Road, Suite 1400 Raleigh, N.C. 27609 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wake County Department of Tax Administration (Cooper, Allison)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Allison Pope Cooper on behalf of Wake County Department of Tax Administration. (Cooper, Allison)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by The United States Environmental Protection Agency, The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fowler, Neal)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Scott Rainey on behalf of Young Moore and Henderson, PA. (Rainey, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Progress Energy, Inc.. (Spencer, Joshua)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Notice filed by The United States of America Correspondence to Clerk of Superior Court - Wake County. (Fowler, Neal)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Neal Fowler on behalf of The United States of America. (Fowler, Neal)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Related Case filed by The United States of America . (Fowler, Neal)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The United States of America from Wake County Superior Court Division, case number 19 CV 008659., filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Declaration of Taking and Notice of Deposit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Supplemental Removal Coversheet) (Fowler, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raleigh-Durham Airport Authority v. Ward Transformer Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of North Carolina
Represented By: Michael Elmer Bulleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Neal Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward Transformer Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Ponzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Neal Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBC 1, LLC
Represented By: Walter L. Tippett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wake County Department of Tax Administration
Represented By: Roger A. Askew
Represented By: Allison Pope Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Moore and Henderson, PA
Represented By: Michael Scott Rainey
Represented By: Michelle Prendergast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unkown Personal Representatives, Heirs and Devisees of Robert E. Ward, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raleigh-Durham Airport Authority
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Dowdy
Represented By: Richard J. Keshian
Represented By: Phillip A. Harris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?