Jiminez v. State of North Carolina
Plaintiff: Jennifer Contreras Jiminez
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Case Number: 5:2019cv00310
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jennifer Contreras Jiminez. (Sellers, N.)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - The court AMENDS its July 2, 2019 Order [D.E.2] to reflect that the clerk need not redesignate this action as a miscellaneous case. The clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 9/4/2019. (Sellers, N.)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - If Jiminez fails to comply with the court's case filing requirements by August 30, 2019, the clerk shall redesignate this action as a miscellaneous case and close the matter without prejudice and without further order from the court. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/30/2019. Sent to Jennifer Contreras Jiminez at 201 S Eugene St. Greensboro, NC 27402 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
July 29, 2019 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III. (Sellers, N.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennifer Contreras Jiminez (Wrong Form) (No Filing fee Paid), filed by Jennifer Contreras Jiminez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jiminez v. State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Contreras Jiminez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?