Wells Fargo, N.A. v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Defendant: A.J.M. Packaging Corporation, charles thompson and Hi-Tech Electric LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00321
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 Declaration of Service by Publication by Wells Fargo, N.A. (Hedrick, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Hi-Tech Electric LLC (Harris, Jason)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hi-Tech Electric LLC. (Harris, Jason)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. A.J.M. Packaging Corporation answer due 10/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 8/30/2019. (Rudd, D.)
August 30, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Rudd, D.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by A.J.M. Packaging Corporation (Chleborowicz, Christopher)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by A.J.M. Packaging Corporation. (Chleborowicz, Christopher)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher A. Chleborowicz on behalf of A.J.M. Packaging Corporation. (Chleborowicz, Christopher)
August 20, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Hi-Tech Electric LLC's Motion for Extension of Time #7 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including September 23, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/20/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
August 20, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Lee, L.)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Hi-Tech Electric LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Harris, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Jessica Lyn Green on behalf of Wells Fargo, N.A.. (Green, Jessica)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to A.J.M. Packaging Corporation, Hi-Tech Electric LLC, Charles Thompson. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent WELLS FARGO & COMPANY for Wells Fargo, N.A.. (Hedrick, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Sims Hedrick on behalf of Wells Fargo, N.A.. (Hedrick, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice filed by Wells Fargo, N.A. regarding #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet and proposed summonses. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons proposed Summons to Charles Thompson, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Hi-Tech Electric LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to A.J.M. Packaging Corporation) (Hedrick, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Wells Fargo, N.A. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2019 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5039821.), filed by Wells Fargo, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposit Account Agreement) (Hedrick, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo, N.A. v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Represented By: Elizabeth Sims Hedrick
Represented By: Jessica Lyn Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.J.M. Packaging Corporation
Represented By: Christopher A. Chleborowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: charles thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi-Tech Electric LLC
Represented By: Jason R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?