Case v. The Green Law Firm, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Case
Defendant: The Green Law Firm, P.C. and John Does 1-25
Case Number: 5:2019cv00337
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Green Law Firm's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #7 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including September 30, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/22/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
August 22, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Lee, L.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by The Green Law Firm, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jolly, Melody)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Melody Jewell Jolly on behalf of The Green Law Firm, P.C.. (Jolly, Melody)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kimberly Case (Deutsch, Raphael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Raphael Y. Deutsch on behalf of Kimberly Case. (Deutsch, Raphael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Green Law Firm, P.C. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
August 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Kimberly Case. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Asa Covington Edwards, IV on behalf of Kimberly Case. (Edwards, Asa)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5051089.), filed by Kimberly Case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: January 15, 2019 Collection Letter, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Edwards, Asa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Case v. The Green Law Firm, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Green Law Firm, P.C.
Represented By: Melody Jewell Jolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Case
Represented By: Asa Covington Edwards, IV
Represented By: Raphael Y. Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?