Heidbreder v. Epic Games, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Heidbreder
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc., a Maryland Corporation and Epic Games, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00348
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Michael Heidbreder. Epic Games, Inc. waiver sent on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Ngo, Ivy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Martha A. Geer on behalf of Michael Heidbreder. (Geer, Martha)
August 9, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number RAL073449. (Rudd, D.)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Epic Games, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
August 9, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit A to Complaint" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all the subsequent attached documents. No other action is required. (Rudd, D.)
August 9, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel including Local Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Michael Heidbreder (Ngo, Ivy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Ivy T. Ngo on behalf of Michael Heidbreder. (Ngo, Ivy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Epic Games, Inc., a Maryland Corporation (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Michael Heidbreder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint- Fortnite End User License Agreement, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint- Fortnite End User License Areement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons) (Ngo, Ivy) Modified on 8/9/2019 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heidbreder v. Epic Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Heidbreder
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Represented By: Martha A. Geer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc., a Maryland Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?