Cooper v. Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America
Plaintiff: Helen M. Cooper
Defendant: Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00355
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Helen M. Cooper. Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Dunn, Steven)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven M. Dunn on behalf of Helen M. Cooper. (Dunn, Steven)
August 28, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #7 Notice of Appearance. When out-of-district counsel files notices of appearance or any other document, all documents must be signed by local counsel in addition to being signed by the filer. See Local Rule 83.1(d). Please re-file this Notice of Appearance in compliance with this rule. (Sellers, N.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven M. Dunn on behalf of Helen M. Cooper. (Dunn, Steven)
August 21, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Alisa D. Huffman on behalf of Helen M. Cooper. (Huffman, Alisa)
August 21, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #5 Notice of Appearance. All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e-filer in this district is available to out of district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. (Sellers, N.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Alisa D. Huffman on behalf of Helen M. Cooper. (Huffman, Alisa)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Helen M. Cooper. Amendment to #2 Financial Disclosure Statement REVISED (Huffman, Alisa)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Helen M. Cooper. Amendment to #1 Complaint REVISED (Huffman, Alisa)
August 16, 2019 Notice to Counsel. All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e-filer in this district is available to out of district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. (Sellers, N.)
August 16, 2019 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint, #2 Financial Disclosure Statement - Counsel's signature line does not comply with Section IV.D.1 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedure Manual. The signature line should read "/s/Alisa D. Huffman. Counsel is directed to refile. (Rudd, D.)
August 16, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. (Rudd, D.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Helen M. Cooper (Huffman, Alisa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5065404.), filed by Helen M. Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Insurance Policy) (Huffman, Alisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen M. Cooper
Represented By: Alisa D. Huffman
Represented By: Steven M. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?