TrialCard Incorporated et al v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Plaintiff: TrialCard Incorporated and TC Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00368
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
August 26, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Financial Disclosure Statement, #4 Financial Disclosure Statement, #5 Notice - other Proposed Summons, #6 Notice - other Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the notice of appearance, financial disclosure statement, proposed summons and the civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)
August 26, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. No further action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Notice filed by TC Holdings, LLC, TrialCard Incorporated Civil Cover Sheet. (Parry, Kirk) (Main Document 6 flattened and replaced on 9/23/2019) (Edwards, S.).
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Notice filed by TC Holdings, LLC, TrialCard Incorporated Proposed Summons. (Parry, Kirk) (Main Document 5 flattened and replaced on 9/23/2019) (Edwards, S.).
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by TC Holdings, LLC (Parry, Kirk) (Main Document 4 flattened and replaced on 9/23/2019) (Edwards, S.).
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by TrialCard Incorporated (Parry, Kirk) (Main Document 3 flattened and replaced on 9/23/2019) (Edwards, S.).
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kirk Alan Parry, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Parry, Kirk) (Main Document 2 flattened and replaced on 9/23/2019) (Edwards, S.).
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5075961.), filed by TrialCard Incorporated, TC Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Travelers Policy information, #2 Exhibit B- Letter to Nat James of TC Holdings, LLC dated 9/13/2016, #3 Exhibit C- Copy of a Copy of Complaint from the Northern District of Illinois (16CV6654), #4 Exhibit D- Copy of correspondence sent via email and US Mail to Robert W. Thomas dated 9/27/2016, #5 Exhibit E- Correspondence sent via email to Nathaniel T. James dated 10/4/2016, #6 Exhibit F- Copy of correspondence sent via email and US Mail to James Vardion dated 10/12/2016, #7 Exhibit G- Correspondence sent via email to Nathaniel T. James dated 10/24/2016, #8 Exhibit H- Correspondence sent via email and overnight mail to James Vardion dated 1/25/2017, #9 Exhibit I- Correspondence sent via email and US Mail to Nathaniel T. James dated 1/27/2017, #10 Exhibit J- Copy of Northern District of Illinois (16CV6654) Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval, #11 Exhibit K- Notification of Docket Entry by the Northern District of Illinois ) (Parry, Kirk) Modified on 8/26/2019 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TrialCard Incorporated et al v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TrialCard Incorporated
Represented By: Kirk Alan Parry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TC Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Kirk Alan Parry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?