GFG 737 Limited v. Jetcraft Corporation et al
Plaintiff: GFG 737 Limited
Defendant: Jetcraft Corporation and Jetcraft Global Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00369
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by GFG 737 Limited as to ALL DEFENDANTS (Jetcraft Corporation; Jetcraft Global Inc.; and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive). (Sidbury, Benjamin)
September 9, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summonses Issued as to Jetcraft Corporation, Jetcraft Global Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Notice filed by GFG 737 Limited regarding #1 Complaint - Proposed Summons (Jetcraft Global Inc.). (Dailey, Colin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Notice filed by GFG 737 Limited regarding #1 Complaint - Proposed Summons (Jetcraft Corporation). (Dailey, Colin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Notice - Civil Cover Sheet filed by GFG 737 Limited regarding #1 Complaint . (Dailey, Colin) Modified on 8/26/2019 - added document description in docket text. (Sellers, N.)
August 26, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 26, 2019 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
August 26, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Benjamin Freedman Sidbury on behalf of GFG 737 Limited. (Sidbury, Benjamin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by GFG 737 Limited identifying Corporate Parent JDO Services Limited for GFG 737 Limited. (Dailey, Colin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5076070.), filed by GFG 737 Limited. (Dailey, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GFG 737 Limited v. Jetcraft Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GFG 737 Limited
Represented By: Colin D.W. Dailey
Represented By: Benjamin Freedman Sidbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetcraft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetcraft Global Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?