Pearson v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: David Pearson
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2019cv00397
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion to Stay. Discovery and all pretrial deadlines are STAYED until April 1, 2020. On April 2, 2020, the parties shall file dismissal documents or file joint status report advising the court what remains to be done with respect to case-specific discovery. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/31/2019. (Collins, S.)
October 25, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #11 Consent MOTION to Stay. (Collins, S.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Osowski, Paul)
October 23, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #10 Notice of Appearance. This document does not comply with Local Rule 83.1. Local Civil Rule 83.1(e) requires attorneys not admitted to this District to file a Notice of Special Appearance that is available on the court's website. Counsel should file a Notice of Special Appearance that complies with this rule. (Collins, S.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Randi Kassan on behalf of David Pearson. (Kassan, Randi)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - This matter, recently transferred from the MDL, comes before the court in furtherance of its case scheduling and management. Pursuant to notice sent to the parties on September 10, 2019, plaintiff was directed to notice appearance of local counsel in this matter. See EDNC Local Civil Rule 83.1(d), (e). Not later than October 23, 2019, plaintiff is ORDERED to cause counsel to enter the requisite notices in this case. Within 14 days of plaintiff's counsel entering notice of appearance, the parties are FURTHER ORDERED to confer about ensuring that MDL orders and other documents are electronically filed in this case. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/2/2019. (Collins, S.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by William Michael Starr on behalf of All Defendants. (Starr, William)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Paul J. Osowski on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated substituting for Richard B. North, Jr.. (Osowski, Paul)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Parties regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona. Case Number 2:16-cv-00923. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
September 6, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Eastern District of North Carolina via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #4 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
April 4, 2016 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-923-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
April 4, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by David Pearson. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
April 4, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12714783 filed by David Pearson.(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pearson
Represented By: T Matthew Leckman
Represented By: Michael G Daly
Represented By: Randi Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Paul J. Osowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Paul J. Osowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?