Dolin v. Kindred et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Dolin
Defendant: Charlene Jones, Riverside Regional Jail Authority, Corizon Health, Wellpath, Shanta Brown, Erica Gordon, Dawn Flippin, Pamala Gilley, Devin Holland, Jeffery Newton, Walter Minton, Jordan Kindred and Karen Craig
Case Number: 5:2019cv00433
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT - In accordance with the court's order entered November 15, 2019, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that this action is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/15/2019. (Collins, S.)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #5 Memorandum and Recommendations; denying #8 Motion for Leave to File and Receive Electronic Documents. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/15/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Christopher Dolin, 1718 River Rock Dr., Chester, VA 23836.) (Collins, S.)
October 24, 2019 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #8 MOTION for Leave to File and Receive Electronic Documents, #5 ORDER and MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (Collins, S.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File and Receive Electronic Documents filed by Christopher Dolin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER And MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #5 ORDER and MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Christopher Dolin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Christopher Dolin. (Collins, S.)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER and MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher Dolin. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 11/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 10/18/2019. (A certified copy of this Order and M&R was sent via US mail to Christopher Dolin, 1718 River Rock Dr., Chester, VA 23836.) (Collins, S.)
October 3, 2019 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Collins, S.)
October 3, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to the Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 5:19-CV-433-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/2/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Christopher Dolin 1718 River Rock Dr., Chester, VA 23836. (Stouch, L.)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Christopher Dolin. (Rudd, D.)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Christopher Dolin. (Rudd, D.)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Christopher Dolin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Jordan Kindred, #4 Proposed Summons Charlene Jones, #5 Proposed Summons Corizon Health, #6 Proposed Summons Dawn Flippin, #7 Proposed Summons Devin Holland, #8 Proposed Summons Erica Gordon, #9 Proposed Summons Jeffery Newton, #10 Proposed Summons Karen Craig, #11 Proposed Summons Pamala Gilley, #12 Proposed Summons Riverside Regional Jail Authority, #13 Proposed Summons Shanta Brown, #14 Proposed Summons Walter Minton, #15 Proposed Summons Wellpath) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolin v. Kindred et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Regional Jail Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanta Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Flippin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamala Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Minton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Kindred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?