United States of America v. Six Parcels of Real Property et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Six Parcels of Real Property, And Any and All Proceeds From the Sale of Said Properties and Real Property
Claimant: Denene Wilder Powell, County of Hertford and Provident Funding Associates, L.P.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00440
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 20 Process Receipt and Return served on 138 E. Mount Tabor Church Road, Ahoskie, NC on 10/17/19. (Collins, S.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 19 Process Receipt and Return served on 512 E. Church Street, Aulander, NC on 10/17/19. (Collins, S.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 18 Process Receipt and Return served on 825 Mill Branch Church Road, Aulander, NC on 10/17/19. (Collins, S.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 17 Process Receipt and Return served on 14.6 Acres of Land Located on Commerce Street, Aulander, NC on 10/17/19. (Collins, S.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 Process Receipt and Return served on 217 Ahoskie Cofield Road, Ahoskie, NC on 10/15/19. (Collins, S.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 Process Receipt and Return served on 421 Catherine Creek Road, Ahoskie, NC on 10/15/19. (Collins, S.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 Claim of Interest in Real Property by County of Hertford. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter from Matthew Fesak, #2 Cover letter for claim from law offices of Revelle & Lee, #3 Tax Bill for 217 Ahoskie Cofield Road, #4 Tax Bill Inquiry for 138 E Mt Tabor Church Road, #5 Tax Bill Inquiry for 421 Catherine Creek Road, #6 Tax Bill Inquiry for Mill Branch Church Road, #7 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 12/18/19. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/13/2019. (Collins, S.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Denene Wilder Powell (Costner, Lisa)
November 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Denene Wilder Powell. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Collins, S.)
November 12, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #6 Notice of Appearance. The address listed on this document does not match the address listed in CM/ECF. Counsel should refer to Pages 5 and 6 of the CM/ECF User's Manual for instructions on updating law firm information. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Collins, S.)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #5 Complaint, ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #5 Complaint by Provident Funding Associates, L.P.. (Presel, Alan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM Deed of Trust by Provident Funding Associates, L.P.. (Presel, Alan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Provident Funding Associates, L.P. (Presel, Alan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Alan Marc Presel on behalf of Provident Funding Associates, L.P.. (Presel, Alan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Notice filed by Real Property(Being Legally Described in Deed Book 666, Pages 454-455 of the Hertford County Registry, North Carolina, Located At 825 Mill Branch Church Road, Aulander, North Carolina, Being Titled in the Name of Denene W. Powell) regarding #1 Complaint Notice of Claim. (Costner, Lisa) Modified on 11/6/2019 to indicate claim filed by Denene Wilder Powell. (Collins, S.).
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Lisa Singer Costner on behalf of Denene Powell. (Costner, Lisa) Modified on 11/12/2019 to change party represented. (Collins, S.).
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A - Deed For Real Property Located At 217 Ahoskie Cofield Road, Ahoskie, North Carolina, Book 765, Pages 170-171, #3 Exhibit B - Deed For Real Property Located At 138 East Mount Tabor Church Road, Ahoskie, North Carolina, Book 746, Pages 286-287, #4 Exhibit C - Deed For Real Property Located At 421 Catherine Creek Road, Ahoskie, North Carolina, Book 760, Pages 853-855, #5 Exhibit D - Deed For Real Property Located At 825 Mill Branch Church Road, Aulander, North Carolina, Book 666, Pages 454-455, #6 Exhibit E - Deed For Real Property Located At 14.6 Acres Of Land Located On Commerce Street, Aulander, North Carolina, Book 873, Pages 34-36, #7 Exhibit F - Deed For Real Property Located At 512 E. Church Street, Aulander, North Carolina, Book 931, Pages 83-86, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fesak, Matthew) Modified on 10/4/2019 (Collins, S.).
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case filed by United States of America . (Fesak, Matthew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice filed by United States of America Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture of Real Property. (Fesak, Matthew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Lee Fesak on behalf of United States of America. (Fesak, Matthew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 **REFILED AT #5 **COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A - Deed For Real Property Located At 217 Ahoskie Cofield Road, Ahoskie, North Carolina, Book 765, Pages 170-171, #3 Exhibit B - Deed For Real Property Located At 138 East Mount Tabor Church Road, Ahoskie, North Carolina, Book 746, Pages 286-287, #4 Exhibit C - Deed For Real Property Located At 421 Catherine Creek Road, Ahoskie, North Carolina, Book 760, Pages 853-855, #5 Exhibit D - Deed For Real Property Located At 825 Mill Branch Church Road, Aulander, North Carolina, Book 666, Pages 454-455, #6 Exhibit E - Deed For Real Property Located At 14.6 Acres Of Land Located On Commerce Street, Aulander, North Carolina, Book 873, Pages 34-36, #7 Exhibit F - Deed For Real Property Located At 512 East Church Street, Aulander, North Carolina, Book 931, Pages 83-86, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fesak, Matthew) Modified on 10/4/2019 (Collins, S.).
October 4, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Six Parcels of Real Property et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Parcels of Real Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: And Any and All Proceeds From the Sale of Said Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Denene Wilder Powell
Represented By: Lisa S Costner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: County of Hertford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Provident Funding Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Alan Marc Presel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?