United States of America v. Abhishek Krishnan's Real and Personal Property et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: U.S. Currency In The Amount of $1,225,778.30, U.S. Currency In The Amount of $1,441,813.42, Real Property, And Any and All Proceeds, U.S. Currency In The Amount of $3,140.91, Abhishek Krishnan's Real and Personal Property and US Trade and Exchange, LLC
Claimant: Wake County Department of Tax Administration, Bank of America, NA, Abhishek Krishnan and American Pure Whey, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00441
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 25 Financial Disclosure Statement by US Trade and Exchange, LLC (Abrams, Elliot)
December 2, 2019 Filing 24 Financial Disclosure Statement by American Pure Whey, LLC (Abrams, Elliot)
December 2, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Elliot Sol Abrams on behalf of American Pure Whey, LLC, Abhishek Krishnan, US Trade and Exchange, LLC. (Abrams, Elliot)
December 2, 2019 Filing 22 CLAIM by US Trade and Exchange, LLC. (Abrams, Elliot)
December 2, 2019 Filing 21 CLAIM by American Pure Whey, LLC, US Trade and Exchange, LLC. (Abrams, Elliot)
December 2, 2019 Filing 20 CLAIM by Abhishek Krishnan. (Abrams, Elliot)
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 CLAIM Asset Forfeiture Claims by Wake County Department of Tax Administration. (Murphy, Kenneth)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Kenneth R. Murphy, III on behalf of Wake County Department of Tax Administration. (Murphy, Kenneth)
November 21, 2019 Filing 17 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #18 ** CLAIM Asset Forfeiture Claims by Real Property(Described in Deed Book 017211, Pages 01862-01863 of the Wake County Registry, Having the Street Address of 2736 Laurel Cherry Street, Raleigh, NC). (Murphy, Kenneth) Modified on 11/21/2019 (Collins, S.).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim of Interest filed by Bank of America Real Property (Described in Deed Book 015780, Pages 01126-01128 of the Wake County Registry, Having the Street Address of 1421 Ballyclare Court, Raleigh, NC). Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/19/2019. (Collins, S.)
November 19, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim of Interest. (Collins, S.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim of Interest filed by Bank of America Real Property(Described in Deed Book 015780, Pages 01126-01128 of the Wake County Registry, Having the Street Address of 1421 Ballyclare Court, Raleigh, NC). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Collins, Claire) Modified on 11/19/2019 to revise docket text add Bank of America, NA as claimant. (Collins, S.).
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Real Property(Described in Deed Book 015780, Pages 01126-01128 of the Wake County Registry, Having the Street Address of 1421 Ballyclare Court, Raleigh, NC) identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Real Property. (Collins, Claire) Modified on 11/19/2019 to add Bank of America as claimant. (Collins, S.).
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Claire L. Collins on behalf of Real Property(Described in Deed Book 015780, Pages 01126-01128 of the Wake County Registry, Having the Street Address of 1421 Ballyclare Court, Raleigh, NC) and Bank of America, NA. (Collins, Claire) Modified on 11/19/2019 to reflect representation of claimant, Bank of America, NA. (Collins, S.).
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 Process Receipt and Return served on 6205 Coldwater Court, Raleigh, NC (Real Property) on 10/29/19. (Collins, S.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 Process Receipt and Return served on 2736 Laurel Cherry Street, Raleigh, NC (Real Property) on 10/29/19. (Collins, S.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 Process Receipt and Return served on 1421 Ballyclaire Court, Raleigh - Real Property on 10/29/19. (Collins, S.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Process Receipt and Return for Complaint for Forfeiture/Warrant served on $3,140.91 in US Currency from Bank of America on 10/23/19. (Collins, S.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Process Receipt and Return for Complaint for Forfeiture/Warrant served on $1,441,813.42 in US Currency held in TD Ameritrade on 10/23/19. (Collins, S.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN for Complaint for Forfeiture/Warrant served on $1,225,778.30 in US Currency from Bank of America on 10/23/19. (Collins, S.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT of Arrest and Notice in Rem issued. (Collins, S.)
October 8, 2019 Remark - Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest #5 referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court. (Collins, S.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest filed by United States of America as to Personal Property. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Harris, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Notice filed by United States of America Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture of Real Property. (Harris, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Related Case filed by United States of America . (Harris, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by John E. Harris on behalf of United States of America. (Harris, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Index For Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Deed For 1421 Balleyclare Court, Raleigh North Carolina, #3 Exhibit B - Deed For 2736 Laurel Cherry Street, Raleigh, North Carolina, #4 Exhibit C - Deed For 6205 Coldwater Court, Raleigh, North Carolina, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Special Agent Paul Pierce with United States Food and Drug Administration, Office of Criminal Investigations, #6 Exhibit E - Superseding Indictment filed in Criminal Case 5:19-CR-299-FL, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harris, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Abhishek Krishnan's Real and Personal Property et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Currency In The Amount of $1,225,778.30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Currency In The Amount of $1,441,813.42
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property
Represented By: Claire L. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: And Any and All Proceeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Currency In The Amount of $3,140.91
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abhishek Krishnan's Real and Personal Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Trade and Exchange, LLC
Represented By: Elliot Sol Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John E. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Wake County Department of Tax Administration
Represented By: Kenneth R. Murphy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bank of America, NA
Represented By: Claire L. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Abhishek Krishnan
Represented By: Elliot Sol Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: American Pure Whey, LLC
Represented By: Elliot Sol Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?