UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Renfrow
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Raymond A. Renfrow
Case Number: 5:2019cv00448
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Bresnahan, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on Raymond A. Renfrow on 10/21/2019. (Bresnahan, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to Raymond A. Renfrow. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by James Francis Bresnahan on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Bresnahan, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Raymond A. Renfrow. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
October 16, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Notice of Appearance. The notice of appearance is a stand alone event. Counsel is directed to refile using the event "Notices - Notice of Appearance". (Rudd, D.)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raymond A. Renfrow, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Bresnahan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Renfrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond A. Renfrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: James Francis Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?