Spence v. Logan
Appellee: John F. Logan
Appellant: Kimberly T. Spence
Interested Party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Case Number: 5:2019cv00456
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Case Submitted to Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard as to #1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, failure to comply with #2 and #5 Judge Warren's Recommendation of Dismissal of Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 Document Entitled: Judge Warren's Recommendation of Dismissal of Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by John F. Logan (Staley, Stephen)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen Troy Staley on behalf of John F. Logan. (Staley, Stephen)
November 7, 2019 SECOND NOTICE - A copy of #2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal sent via electronically to counsel on docket sheet and a copy mailed along with a blank notice of self representation and a blank financial disclosure statement mailed via US Mail to Kimberly T. Spence at 187 Advance Drive, Lillington, NC 27546 on November 7, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
October 16, 2019 Remark - A copy of #2 notice to parties mailed via US Mail to Kimberly T. Spence along with a blank notice of self representation and a blank financial disclosure statement. (Rudd, D.)
October 16, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-03006-5-DMW. (Attachments: #1 Judge David M. Warren's Order dated October 9, 2019) (Donleycott, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spence v. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John F. Logan
Represented By: Stephen Troy Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kimberly T. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?