Williams v. AT&T Mobility, LLC
Plaintiff: Jason Williams
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00475
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: #153 Notice. Counsel is reminded that if they have any deadlines or hearings falling during the time period that counsel is unavailable they must file the appropriate motions to continue such deadlines. (Stouch, L.)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Document: USM 285 Form - US Marshal unable to serve #130 Order and #131 Judgment on Anexio Data Centers, LLC. (Stouch, L.)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Notice filed by Jason Williams Amended Notice of Unavailability of Terence S. Reynolds. (Reynolds, Terence)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Notice filed by Jason Williams Notice of Unavailability Terence S. Reynolds. (Reynolds, Terence)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER denying #134 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 7/19/2022. (Stouch, L.)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #134 MOTION to Compel, #121 MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Alleged Crypto-Mining Damages, #127 MOTION to Seal #120 PROPOSED SEALED Document, #125 PROPOSED SEALED Document, #119 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #123 MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of Emotional Distress of Plaintiff or Family. (Stouch, L.)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #123 MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of Emotional Distress of Plaintiff or Family filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #121 MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Alleged Crypto-Mining Damages filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment or For Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: AT&T Mobility must submit the documents listed in its privilege log (D.E. 137-10) to the court for in camera review no later than June 3, 2022. The documents should be submitted to Documents_USMJ_Numbers@nced.uscourts.gov. Entered by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 5/31/2022. (Brewer, C)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #134 MOTION to Compel. (Stouch, L.)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #134 MOTION to Compel filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ann Beck, #2 Declaration of Nancy Stagg) (Dowdy, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Anexio Managed Services, LLC c/o Registered Agent Paracorp Incorporated served with #130 Order and #131 Judgment via certified mail on 5/2/2022. (Stouch, L.)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Declaration of Christopher LaVigne in Support of Plaintiff Williams' Opposition to AT&T's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motions in Limine by Jason Williams filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Declaration of Plaintiff Jason Williams in Opposition to #118 AT&T's Motion for Summary Judgment by Jason Williams filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Appendix to the Statement of Facts regarding #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment or For Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Statement of Material Facts regarding #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment or For Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment or For Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #123 MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of Emotional Distress of Plaintiff or Family filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #121 MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Alleged Crypto-Mining Damages filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Proposed Order regarding #134 MOTION to Compel filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Declaration of Christopher LaVigne re #134 MOTION to Compel by Jason Williams filed by Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q) (LaVigne, Christopher)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Declaration of Jason Williams ISO of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Jason Williams filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Memorandum in Support regarding #134 MOTION to Compel by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION to Compel filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #133 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment or For Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative, #123 MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of Emotional Distress of Plaintiff. (Sellers, N.)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting the Joint Motion for Extension of Time #133 . Plaintiff has up to and including May 2, 2022, within which to respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment #118 and Motions in Limine #121 #123 . Defendant has up to and including June 3, 2022, within which to file replies in support of the motions. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/18/2022. (Hockaday, A.)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment or For Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative, #123 MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of Emotional Distress of Plaintiff or Family, #121 MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Alleged Crypto-Mining Damages filed by Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time) (LaVigne, Christopher)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #132 Stipulation. This document should have been styled as a joint motion. Counsel is directed to correct and refile the document as a motion, using the motion event and conforming to the requirements of Local Rule 10.1. Further, at the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. (Waddell, K.)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STIPULATION regarding Parties' Summary Judgment Briefing by Jason Williams (LaVigne, Christopher)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 JUDGMENT on Civil Contempt against Non-Party. Signed by deputy clerk for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/5/2022. (Stouch, L.)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. The Anexio Companies remain in contempt of this Court and as of date of the entry of this Order, have not purged themselves of contempt. 2. The Anexio Companies are jointly and severally responsible for and shall pay the coercive daily fine amount of $1,000.00 for the period running from February 23, 2022, to March 17, 2022, for contempt sanctions of $23,000.00 plus attorney's fees and costs taxed to the Anexio Companies in the Court's February 9, 2022 Order in the amount of $4,007.50, for a total amount of $27,007.50. 3. The Clerk shall docket a judgment against the Anexio Companies for the amount of $27,007.50. 4. The Anexio Companies must provide the information compelled by the Court and pay the fine assessed herein to purge themselves of contempt. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/5/2022. (Stouch, L.)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark - #129 Notice and proposed order submitted to US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for review. (Stouch, L.)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark - Certified copy of #130 Order and #131 Judgment forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms addressed to Anexio Data Centers, LLC, c/o Tony Pompliano, 106 Birkhaven Dr., Cary, NC 27518 and Anexio Managed Services, LLC, c/o Registered Agent Paracorp Incorporated, 176 Mine Lake Ct., # 100, Raleigh, NC 27615. (Stouch, L.)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Notice filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC regarding #117 Contempt Hearing, filing Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Memorandum in Support regarding #127 MOTION to Seal #120 PROPOSED SEALED Document, #125 PROPOSED SEALED Document, #119 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION to Seal #120 PROPOSED SEALED Document, #125 PROPOSED SEALED Document, #119 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Dowdy in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Exhibit A - Redacted Mem. of Law in Support of AT&T's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit B - Redacted Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, #4 Exhibit C - Appendix of Exhibits with Redacted Exhibits 4 & 5, #5 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal) (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Declaration regarding #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment or For Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative, #123 MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of Emotional Distress of Plaintiff or Family, #121 MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Alleged Crypto-Mining Damages by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 PROPOSED SEALED Document: (Selected Participants Only)by AT&T MOBILITY LLC (available to: Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC, Plaintiff Jason Williams) regarding #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment or For Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative, #123 MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of Emotional Distress of Plaintiff or Family, #121 MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Alleged Crypto-Mining Damages. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Jason Williams Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses to AT&T's Second Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3 (Part 1 of 2) - AT&T's Wireless Customer Agreement (Mar-Nov 2018), #4 Exhibit 3 (Part 2 of 2) - AT&T's Wireless Customer Agreement (Nov. 2018-Feb. 2019), #5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of Valerie Scheder Deposition, #6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of Ray Hill Deposition, #7 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Signed Electronic Acknowledgement Form, #8 Exhibit 7 - Delaware Department of State Information on Apollo Kids Mining, LLC) (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Memorandum in Support regarding #123 MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of Emotional Distress of Plaintiff or Family filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of Emotional Distress of Plaintiff or Family filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Memorandum in Support regarding #121 MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Alleged Crypto-Mining Damages filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Alleged Crypto-Mining Damages filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 PROPOSED SEALED Document: (Selected Participants Only)by AT&T MOBILITY LLC (available to: Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC, Plaintiff Jason Williams) regarding #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment or For Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative. (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only)by AT&T Mobility LLC (available to: Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC, Plaintiff Jason Williams) regarding #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment or For Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative. (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment or For Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Minute Entry for proceedings held in Raleigh, NC before District Judge Terrence W. Boyle: Contempt Hearing held on 3/17/2022. Counsel present and ready to proceed. No representative has appeared on behalf of third party Anexio. Counsel for the defendant is to submit a proposed order to the Court for review and approval. (Court Reporter Michelle McGirr) (Stouch, L.)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Declaration regarding #115 Certificate of Service by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Certificate of Service filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC Re Anexio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Proof of Service on Anexio) (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark - #114 Status Report submitted to US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for review. (Stouch, L.)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER - In light of the March 14, 2022, status update and this Court's order entered March 3, 2022, a hearing on the continued failure to comply with the Courts 12 October 2021 order or its order of civil contempt by Anexio will be held before the undersigned on March 17, 2022 at 3:00PM at the United States Courthouse at 310 New Bern Avenue, Raleigh, North Carolina. AT&T is DIRECTED to serve the Anexio entities with a copy of this text order by email and hand delivery via the same addresses as provided in [DE 106] and [DE 114]. Entered by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/15/2022. (Stouch, L.)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order **** Set Hearing: Contempt Hearing set for 3/17/2022 at 03:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Terrence W. Boyle. (Stouch, L.)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STATUS REPORT by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service) (Stagg, Nancy)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER - AT&T Mobility shall file a second status report on March 14, 2022, or following its receipt of a response to the order of contempt by Anexio, whichever is earlier. Should Anexio continue in its non-responsiveness, the Court will hold a hearing on the matter during its March 15, 2022, term at Raleigh, with a specific date and time to be set by separate notice. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/3/2022. (Stouch, L.)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark - #112 Status Report submitted to US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for review. (Stouch, L.)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STATUS REPORT re Anexio by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (1) - email to Anexio (2-18-22), #2 Exhibit (2) - FedEx to Anexio Data Centers (2-21-22), #3 Exhibit (3) FedEx to Anexio Managed Services (2-23-22), #4 Exhibit (4) - Hand delivery to Anexio (2-22-22)) (Stagg, Nancy)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #102 Motion for Order of Civil Contempt Against Non-Parties Anexio Data Centers, LLC and Anexio Managed Services, LLC filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/18/2022. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Terrence W. Boyle: Motion Hearing held on 2/17/2022 regarding #102 MOTION for Order of Civil Contempt Against Non-Parties Anexio Data Centers, LLC and Anexio Managed Services, LLC filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. Counsel for plaintiff and defendant present. No representative for Anexio parties present. The Court will find the third parties to be in contempt. A written order will follow. (Court Reporter Michelle McGirr) (Stouch, L.)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Certificate of Service filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service on Anexio) (Stagg, Nancy)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting in part #92 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 2/8/2022. (Stouch, L.)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - The hearing on the motion for order of civil contempt before the undersigned is RESET for Thursday February 17, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. at the United States Courthouse at 310 New Bern Avenue, Raleigh, NC. Defendant shall provide notice of this hearing to representatives of Anexio, Anexio Data Centers, and Anexio Managed Services via the addresses and methods listed in defendant's certificate of service [DE 107] and file proof of the same within three (3) days of the date of entry of this order. Entered by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/9/2022. (Stouch, L.)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Reset Hearing as to #102 MOTION for Order of Civil Contempt Against Non-Parties Anexio Data Centers, LLC and Anexio Managed Services, LLC . Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2022 at 03:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Terrence W. Boyle. (Stouch, L.)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Certificate of Service filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC Regarding Anexio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service on Anexio) (Stagg, Nancy)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - A hearing on the motion for order of civil contempt will be held before the undersigned on Wednesday February 16, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. at the United States Courthouse at 310 New Bern Avenue, Raleigh, NC. Defendant shall provide notice of this hearing to representatives of Anexio, Anexio Data Centers, and Anexio Managed Services via the addresses and methods listed in defendants motion at [DE 106] and file proof of the same within five (5) days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/27/2022. (Stouch, L.)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearing as to #102 MOTION for Order of Civil Contempt Against Non-Parties Anexio Data Centers, LLC and Anexio Managed Services, LLC . Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Terrence W. Boyle. (Stouch, L.)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II: #102 MOTION for Order of Civil Contempt Against Non-Parties Anexio Data Centers, LLC and Anexio Managed Services, LLC. Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle. (Stouch, L.)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Notice filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC Regarding Anexio's Non-Compliance With Order and Request for Hearing on Motion for Order of Civil Contempt Against Non-Parties Anexio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anexio Emails) (Dowdy, Joseph)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #102 MOTION for Order of Civil Contempt Against Non-Parties Anexio Data Centers, LLC and Anexio Managed Services, LLC and #106 Notice . (Stouch, L.)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER - After holding a status conference with the parties, the court modifies the scheduling order as follows: 1. All discovery shall be initiated in time to be completed by February 28, 2022. 2. All motions except those relating to the admissibility of evidence at trial must be filed on or before March 30, 2022. All other deadlines are unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 12/20/2021. (Rudd, D.)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II -Status Conference held on 12/20/2021 via video conference. Parties present via video. Parties update the court as to the status of this case. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter - FTR) (Brewer, C)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Memorandum in Support regarding #102 MOTION for Order of Civil Contempt Against Non-Parties Anexio Data Centers, LLC and Anexio Managed Services, LLC filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION for Order of Civil Contempt Against Non-Parties Anexio Data Centers, LLC and Anexio Managed Services, LLC filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Breslin, #2 Exhibit A - Oct. 12th email to Long, #3 Exhibit B - Nov. 8th email from Pompliano, #4 Exhibit C - Nov. 12th email to Long, Pompliano, #5 Exhibit D - Nov. 16th email from Long, #6 Exhibit E - Nov. 26th email from Long, #7 Exhibit F - Nov. 30th email from Long, #8 Text of Proposed Order) (Dowdy, Joseph)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ***DISREGARD: Entered in incorrect case.*** ORDER Appointing Mediator. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/13/2021. Copy sent via US Mail to Robert A. Beason of Beason & Ellis Conflict Resolution, LLC, 2741 University Drive, P O Box 52270,Durham, NC 27717-2270. (Stouch, L.) Modified on 12/13/2021 (Stouch, L.).
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order Setting Hearings - Status Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 02:00 PM by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers II. The case manager will provide the videoconference information to the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 12/13/2021. (Stouch, L.)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Certificate of Service filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FedEx Delivery Confirmations) (Breslin, Michael)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Notice: The court notes that AT&T has indicated that the Axios Entities have not complied with the courts October 12, 2021 Subpoena-Related Order. If AT&T seeks to initiate contempt proceedings against the Axios Entities, it should do so promptly in [t]he court for the district where compliance is required[.] Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(g). Entered by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 12/10/2021. (Brewer, C)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery (Joint Filing) by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Breslin, Michael)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Nancy L. Stagg on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Stagg, Nancy)
December 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - The court orders that no later than December 10, 2021, AT&T must serve a copy of the statement and a copy of this order on the Anexio Entities in a manner consistent with Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. AT&T shall file a document with the court reflecting the manner of service promptly after completing service. The Anexio Entities will then have until January 14, 2022, to submit objections to AT&Ts statement of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 12/3/2021. (Stouch, L.)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Document: Return Receipt regarding #88 Order received by Anexio, Inc., Registered Agent, Paracorp Incorporated, 155 Office Plaza Drive, 1st Floor, Tallahassee, FL 32301 on 11/8/2021. (Stouch, L.)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #92 MOTION for Bill of Costs (Statement of Fees and Costs). (Stouch, L.)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred to Clerk: #92 MOTION for Bill of Costs (Statement of Fees and Costs) (Stouch, L.)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #92 MOTION for Bill of Costs (Statement of Fees and Costs). (Stouch, L.)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Document: Return Receipt regarding #88 Order received by Anexio Managed Services, LLC c/o Registered Agent Paracorp Incorporated 176 Mine Lake Ct. #100 Raleigh NC 27615 on 10/14/2021. (Sellers, N.)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Document: Return Receipt regarding #88 Order received by Anexio Data Centers, LLC c/o Registered Agent Paracorp Inc. 176 Mine Lake Ct. #100 Raleigh, NC 27615 on 10/14/2021. (Sellers, N.)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Bill of Costs (Statement of Fees and Costs) filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Breslin, #2 Exhibit A) (Dowdy, Joseph)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STATUS REPORT by both parties regarding their discovery efforts by Jason Williams (LaVigne, Christopher)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Martin J Auerbach on behalf of Jason Williams. (Auerbach, Martin)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #85 Motion for Order of Contempt and to Enforce Subpoenas on Non-Party Anexio Entities. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 10/12/2021. Sent to Anexio Managed Services, LLC c/o Registered Agent Paracorp Incorporated 176 Mine Lake Ct. #100, Raleigh, NC 27615; ANEXIO, INC Registered Agent, PARACORP INCORPORATED 155 OFFICE PLAZA DRIVE, 1ST FLOOR TALLAHASSEE, FL 32301; and Anexio Data Centers, LLC c/o Registered Agent Paracorp Incorporated 176 Mine Lake,Ct. #100 Raleigh, NC 27615 via US Mail return receipt requested. (Sellers, N.)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #85 MOTION for Order of Contempt and to Enforce Subpoenas on Non-Party Anexio Entities. (Sellers, N.)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #84 Motion to Enter Agreed Order Regarding Discovery and Case Schedule. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/17/2021. (Sellers, N.)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Memorandum in Support regarding #85 MOTION for Order of Contempt and to Enforce Subpoenas on Non-Party Anexio Entities filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Order of Contempt and to Enforce Subpoenas on Non-Party Anexio Entities filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Breslin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order) (Dowdy, Joseph)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #84 Joint MOTION to Enter Agreed Order Regarding Discovery and Case Schedule. (Sellers, N.)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Joint MOTION to Enter Agreed Order Regarding Discovery and Case Schedule filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dowdy, Joseph)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Affidavit of Service for Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC served on Anexio, Inc. on 08/10/2021. (Dowdy, Joseph)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Affidavit of Service for Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition and Produce Documents filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC served on Anexio Managed Services, LLC on 7/14/21. (Dowdy, Joseph)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Affidavit of Service for Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition and Produce Documents filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC served on Anexio Data Centers, LLC on 7/14/21. (Dowdy, Joseph)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #77 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Phillip A. Harris, Jr terminated. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/29/2021. (Stouch, L.)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #77 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Phillip A. Harris, Jr.). (Stouch, L.)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Stouch, L.)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/28/2021. (Stouch, L.)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Phillip A. Harris, Jr.) filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Harris, Phillip)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #75 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. (Stouch, L.)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Proposed Order regarding #75 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Amended Answer showing amendments) (Dowdy, Joseph)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Motion to Set Mediation Date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 6/15/2021. (Stouch, L.)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Joint MOTION Set Mediation Date filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dowdy, Joseph)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #73 Joint MOTION Set Mediation Date. (Stouch, L.)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time (Scheduling Order Dates). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 5/6/2021. (Stouch, L.)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #71 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Scheduling Order Dates). (Stouch, L.)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Scheduling Order Dates) filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dowdy, Joseph)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #61 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 4/13/2021. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Notice filed by Jason Williams indicating, for each of AT&T's requests for production at issue, whether documents are being withheld on the basis of Mr. Williams' objections to those requests. (LaVigne, Christopher)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order Rule 34(b)(2)(C) requires, among other things, that an objection must state whether any responsive materials are being withheld on the basis of that objection. A review of the responses to the requests for production at issue shows that Williams did not comply with this provision. No later than April 9, 2021, Williams will file a notice with the court indicating, for each request at issue, whether documents are being withheld on the basis of the objections. Furthermore, Rule 34(b)(2)(C) requires that if a request is only objectionable in part, the responding party, must specify the part and permit inspection of the rest. No later than April 9, 2021, to the extent he has not already done so, Williams must make a good faith effort to identify and produce documents that are responsive to the unobjectionable portions of the requests at issue. Counsel should review the Advisory Committee Notes to the 2015 Amendment for Rule 34 for additional guidance on this issue. Entered by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 4/1/2021. (Brewer, C)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting in part #56 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 4/1/2021. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #61 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Jason Williams to Produce Documents and Respond to Interrogatories. (Stouch, L.)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Declaration regarding #66 Memorandum in Opposition by Jason Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (LaVigne, Christopher)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #61 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Jason Williams to Produce Documents and Respond to Interrogatories filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II in Raleigh via videoconference - Hearing on Plaintiff's motion to compel #56 held on 3/16/2021. Parties present via videoconference. The Court makes opening remarks. Parties make arguments regarding the motion. The Court grants the motion to compel. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter - FTR) (Brewer, C)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Joseph E. Gallo on behalf of Jason Williams. (Gallo, Joseph)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Adam P. Wiley on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Wiley, Adam)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Memorandum in Support regarding #61 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Jason Williams to Produce Documents and Respond to Interrogatories filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Jason Williams to Produce Documents and Respond to Interrogatories filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Michael Breslin Declaration and Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 - Chart of Estoppel or Inference Sanctions Requested) (Dowdy, Joseph)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order: The court will hold a hearing by videoconference on Plaintiffs Motion to Compel by videoconference on March 16, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court shall provide the parties with the necessary information to participate in the hearing. (Brewer, C)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #56 MOTION to Compel. (Stouch, L.)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #56 MOTION to Compel filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Breslin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Dowdy, Joseph)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Proposed Order regarding #56 MOTION to Compel filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Declaration regarding #56 MOTION to Compel by Jason Williams filed by Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L) (LaVigne, Christopher)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Memorandum in Support regarding #56 MOTION to Compel filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Compel filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time (Scheduling Order Dates). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 11/30/2020. (Stouch, L.)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Scheduling Order Dates). (Stouch, L.)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Scheduling Order Dates) filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines) (Dowdy, Joseph)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Affidavit of Service for subpoena to produce documents filed by Jason Williams served on Convergys Customer Management Group Inc. n/k/a Concentrix Corporation on 9/8/2020. (LaVigne, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Affidavit of Service for subpoena to produce documents filed by Jason Williams served on TPUSA - FHCS, Inc. on 9/11/2020. (LaVigne, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Affidavit of Service for Subpoena to produce documents filed by Jason Williams served on Alorica, Inc. on 9/4/2020. (LaVigne, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Affidavit of Service for subpoena to produce documents filed by Jason Williams served on Prime Communications, L.P. on 9/4/2020. (LaVigne, Christopher)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William Geraci terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/20/2020. (Stouch, L.)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #48 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Stouch, L.)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order) (Geraci, William)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/15/2020. (Stouch, L.)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Appointing Mediator. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/12/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to Rene Stemple Trehy (Ellis) Beason & Trehy Conflict Resolution, LLC 2741 University Drive, Post Office Box 52270, Durham, NC, 27717. (Stouch, L.)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. (Stouch, L.)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Joint Stipulated Protective Order) (Dowdy, Joseph)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Selection of Rene Stemple Trehy (Ellis) (Jointly Nominated by the Parties) as mediator filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Christopher N. LaVigne on behalf of Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/19/2021. Motions due by 4/16/2021. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 5/15/2020. (Sellers, N.)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 6/5/2020. (Stouch, L.)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Entry of Rule 502(d) Order. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/13/2020. (Stouch, L.)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #40 Joint MOTION for Entry of Rule 502(d) Order. (Stouch, L.)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Remark - #39 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers for the entry of a scheduling order. (Stouch, L.)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Entry of Rule 502(d) Order filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Rule 502(d) Order) (Dowdy, Joseph)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Michael J. Breslin on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Breslin, Michael)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patrick A. Bradford terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/20/2020. (Stouch, L.)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #36 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Stouch, L.)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order) (Bradford, Patrick)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #31 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including April 15, 2020, within which to answer the Complaint #2 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/6/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sarah A. Baugh terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/3/2020. (Stouch, L.)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dwayne D. Sam terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/3/2020. (Stouch, L.)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas Popejoy terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/3/2020. (Stouch, L.)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #2 Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, #27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, #26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Stouch, L.)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #2 Complaint, filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dowdy, Joseph)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Notice of Appearance filed by Phillip A. Harris, Jr on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Harris, Phillip)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/2/2020. (Stouch, L.)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order) (Popejoy, Thomas)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order) (Sam, Dwayne)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order) (Baugh, Sarah)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by William Geraci on behalf of Jason Williams. (Geraci, William)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Patrick A. Bradford on behalf of Jason Williams. (Bradford, Patrick)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Terence S. Reynolds on behalf of Jason Williams. (Reynolds, Terence)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Terence S. Reynolds on behalf of Jason Williams. (Reynolds, Terence)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: #23 Notice of Special Appearance, #22 Notice of Special Appearance. All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e-filer in this district is available to out of district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. (Stouch, L.)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/25/2020. (Stouch, L.)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/25/2020. (Stouch, L.)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (12(b)(6), 12(b)(1) and 9(b)). (Stouch, L.)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (12(b)(6), 12(b)(1) and 9(b)) filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (12(b)(6), 12(b)(1) and 9(b)) filed by Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response regarding #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (12(b)(6), 12(b)(1) and 9(b)). Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/31/2019. The parties are reminded to read the attached order in its entirety. (Downing, L.)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (12(b)(6), 12(b)(1) and 9(b)) filed by Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time) (Reynolds, Terence)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Motion referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (12(b)(6), 12(b)(1) and 9(b)). (Downing, L.)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order REMINDER TO COUNSEL as to AT&T Mobility, LLC. Pursuant to Judge Boyle's #Practice Preferences located on the court's website, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of all documents over 20 pages, by mailing or delivering to the clerk's office in Raleigh. (Stouch, L.)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Memorandum in Support regarding #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (12(b)(6), 12(b)(1) and 9(b)) filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (12(b)(6), 12(b)(1) and 9(b)) filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Dowdy, Joseph)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Dowdy, Joseph)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Dwayne D. Sam on behalf of Jason Williams. (Sam, Dwayne)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Christopher N. LaVigne on behalf of Jason Williams. (LaVigne, Christopher)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #10 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including December 20, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #2 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/8/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dowdy, Joseph)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Stouch, L.)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Thomas Popejoy on behalf of Jason Williams. (Popejoy, Thomas)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Sarah A. Baugh on behalf of Jason Williams. (Baugh, Sarah)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to AT&T Mobility, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Redesignating Division to Western Division. This case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, Chief United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 5:19-CV-475-BO. No further filing shall bemade in 4:19-CV-153-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/25/2019. (Stouch, L.)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jason Williams (Reynolds, Terence)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Lucas David Garber on behalf of Jason Williams. (Garber, Lucas)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Terence S. Reynolds on behalf of Jason Williams. (Reynolds, Terence)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORRECTED COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5157699.), filed by Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AT&T Privacy Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Reynolds, Terence) Modified on 10/25/2019 to reflect corrected complaint filed. (Rudd, D.)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SEE CORRECTED COMPLAINT AT DE #2 against AT&T Mobility, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5157699.), filed by Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Reynolds, Terence) Modified on 10/25/2019 to reflect that corrected complaint filed a DE #2 . (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. AT&T Mobility, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Dowdy
Represented By: Phillip A. Harris, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Breslin
Represented By: Adam P. Wiley
Represented By: Nancy L. Stagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Williams
Represented By: Lucas David Garber
Represented By: Terence S. Reynolds
Represented By: Sarah A. Baugh
Represented By: Dwayne D. Sam
Represented By: Christopher N. LaVigne
Represented By: Thomas Popejoy
Represented By: William Geraci
Represented By: Patrick A. Bradford
Represented By: Joseph E. Gallo
Represented By: Martin J Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?