Mercier et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephen E. Mercier and Brenda F. Harris
Defendant: Taylor Pettegrew, Anthony Vallani, Phillip Montes and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00491
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Void Judgment and Bill of Reconsideration Time is of Essence. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/15/2019. (Stouch, L.)
November 15, 2019 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party Brenda F. Harris, Stephen E. Mercier has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Stouch, L.)
November 13, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #10 MOTION to Void Judgment and Bill of Reconsideration Time is of Essence. (Stouch, L.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Void Judgment and Bill of Reconsideration Time is of Essence. filed by Brenda F. Harris, Stephen E. Mercier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Void Orders, Application for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit B - Order, #3 Exhibit C - Order) (Stouch, L.)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Orderand Injunction; Report of Officers of Court Misconduct/Violations. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 11/7/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Stephen E. Mercier and Brenda F. Harris 2641 Crooked Creek Lane, Nashville, NC 27856. (Stouch, L.)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; denying #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 11/7/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Stephen E. Mercier and Brenda F. Harris 2641 Crooked Creek Lane, Nashville, NC 27856. (Stouch, L.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND MOTION for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction; Report of Officers of Court Misconduct/Violations filed by Brenda F. Harris, Stephen E. Mercier. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Letter to Chief Judge Boyle, #3 Report of Foreclosure Sale, #4 Exhibit K - Spousal Rights, #5 Exhibit J - Report of Foreclosure Sale, #6 Exhibit L - Audit Report, #7 Exhibit M - Evaluation of Violations Pursuant to Consent Agreements, #8 Exhibit N - Albertelli Law Partners of North Carolina - Special Proceedings, #9 Exhibit O - NC Gen. Stats., #10 Exhibit P - FDIC Litigation Cases) (Stouch, L.)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Summonses issued at intake. (Stouch, L.)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Brenda F. Harris. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Stephen E. Mercier. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Brenda F. Harris, Stephen E. Mercier. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Brenda F. Harris, Stephen E. Mercier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Substitute Trustee's Amended Notice of Foreclsoure Sale of Ral Property) (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number RAL075092), filed by Stephen E. Mercier, Brenda F. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Supporting Fact, Copy of 17-SP-336 Notice of Hearing, Suppelmental History, #2 Exhibit A- Documents from 17-SP-336, Order regarding appeal bond, correspondence, order of the court, notice of hearing on appeal, cancellation of foreclosure sale, #3 Exhibit B- Certificate of Marriage, Certificate of Death, Application for summary for wife's or husband's insurance benefits, #4 Exhibit C- Quitclaim Deed, #5 Exhibit D- Quitclaim Deed, #6 Exhibit E- Loan Pollicy Schedule A, Schedule B-I, Scheduled B-II, Title Insurance Company Form 8.1, 9, Title Ins. Co. Policy, Attorneys Title Ins Agency, Inc., #7 Exhibit E-A Warranty Deed, Deed of Trust, #8 Exhibit F- Warranty Deed,, #9 Exhibit G- Blank, #10 Exhibit H-Note, Loan Modification Agreement, Payoff Calculation Totals (Pay4), Mortgage Account Statement, Loan Modification Worksheet, Correspondence, #11 Exhibit I- Email Correspondence, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercier et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Pettegrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Vallani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Montes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen E. Mercier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda F. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?