Davis v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gary Davis
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00496
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/4/2019. (Stouch, L.)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Patton, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Davis. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Shapiro, Craig)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by GARY DAVIS (Shapiro, Craig)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Craig M. Shapiro on behalf of GARY DAVIS. (Shapiro, Craig)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caliber Home Loans, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5173168.), filed by GARY DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Shapiro, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Davis
Represented By: Craig M. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?