Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC v. Atticus, LLC
Plaintiff: Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC
Defendant: Atticus, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00509
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Memorandum in Support regarding #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Atticus, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Scheffel Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Scheffel, Robert) Modified on 1/6/2020 - added docket entry relationship and terminated as motion. (Sellers, N.)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Atticus, LLC. (Scheffel, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Matthew J. Dowd on behalf of Atticus, LLC. (Dowd, Matthew)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Robert J. Scheffel on behalf of Atticus, LLC. (Scheffel, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Matthew J. Dowd on behalf of Atticus, LLC. (Dowd, Matthew)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Robert J. Scheffel on behalf of Atticus, LLC. (Scheffel, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: #16 Notice of Special Appearance, #17 Notice of Special Appearance. When out-of-district counsel files notices of appearance or any other document, all documents must be signed by local counsel in addition to being signed by the filer. See Local Rule 83.1(d). Please re-file the Notices of appearance with the appropriate signatures. (Sellers, N.)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Atticus, LLC answer due 1/3/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/27/2019. (Sellers, N.)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert J. Morris on behalf of Atticus, LLC. (Morris, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Atticus, LLC (Morris, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Atticus, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order) (Morris, Robert)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC. Atticus, LLC served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (Wheeler, Clay)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Russell E. Levine on behalf of Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC. (Levine, Russell)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Hari Santhanam on behalf of Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC. (Santhanam, Hari)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Atticus, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice filed by Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC regarding #6 Summons Issued (PROPOSED CORRECTED). (Wheeler, Clay)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Atticus, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PATENT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450 Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 via US Mail on November 13, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice filed by Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC regarding #1 Complaint,,,, AO 120 Form for Syngenta-Atticus. (Wheeler, Clay)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Campbell Wheeler on behalf of Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC. (Wheeler, Clay)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC (Wheeler, Clay)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atticus, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5180542.), filed by Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit 1 - Screenshots Updated 2019-11-07, #5 Exhibit 2 - Atticus-Acadia-2-SC-Specimen, #6 Exhibit 3 - Acadia-ESQ-2.5-GAL-Specimen, #7 Exhibit 4 - Atticus-Aquila-XL-Specimen, #8 Exhibit 5 - Atticus-Artavia-2-SC-Specimen, #9 Exhibit 6 - Artavia-Xcel-Specimen, #10 Exhibit 7 - PN8, 124,761, #11 Exhibit 8 - PN8, 552,185, #12 Exhibit 9 - Acadia_2_SC_sell_sheet_final_web-1, #13 Exhibit 10 - Acadia_ESQ_SellSheet_web, #14 Exhibit 11 - Aquila_XL_sell_sheet_final_lo, #15 Exhibit 12 - Artavia_2SC_SellSheet_final_lowres, #16 Exhibit 13 - Artavia_Xcel_SellSheet_web, #17 Exhibit 14 - 2019-06-11 R Levine to R Canady at Atticus, #18 Exhibit 15 - RE_Inquiry to Atticus Concerning U.S. Patent, #19 Exhibit 16 - Syngenta Post-Trial Press Release, #20 Exhibit 17 - AGDaily article, #21 Exhibit 18 - Generics Certificate of Interest) (Wheeler, Clay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC v. Atticus, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC
Represented By: Clay Campbell Wheeler
Represented By: Clay C. Wheeler
Represented By: Russell E. Levine
Represented By: Hari Santhanam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atticus, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Morris
Represented By: Matthew J. Dowd
Represented By: Robert J. Scheffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?